Walters v. Gill Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lori Walters
Defendant: Gill Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00069
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Referring Judge: Matthew A Stinnett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents, and Requests for Admission by Lori Walters.(Shepherd, Taylor) Modified text on 5/6/2021 (JLM).
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Rule 26 Disclosures by Lori Walters.(Shepherd, Taylor)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST DISCLOSURES Served Upon Counsel for Plaintiff by Gill Industries, Inc..(Pabon, Heather)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: #24 Status Report (KJR)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Gill Industries, Inc.. (Pabon, Heather)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) w/in 14 days parties shall exchange info required by Rule 26(a)(1); (2) by 9/15/21, pla disclosure the identify of expert witnesses who may be used & trial & reports; dft by 10/15/21; (3) supplementation shall be due w/in 30 days of new info; (4) Discovery due by 11/15/2021; (5) all discovery disputes are REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett; (6) all motions for extensions of time shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition; (7) parties may not by agreement extend any ddls set forth in this scheduling order; (8) Amended Pleadings & Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 8/6/2021; (9) pla shall file any motion to certify class by 11/29/21; (10) Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 12/15/2021; (11) Pretrial Filings due by 4/25/2022; (12) by 4/25/22 counsel shall premark exhibits; (13) by 4/25/22 counsel shall file Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions; (14) by 5/2/22 counsel shall file objections to the use of depos or admissibility of exhibits; (15) PT filings may be submitted to the undersigned by email; (16) by 5/9/22 parties shall submit to chambers a cop of exhibits; (17) JURY TRIAL set for 5/17/2022 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves (5 days) counsel be present at 8:30 am; (18) parties may request a PT conf if desired; (19) parties are directed to file a joint status report the 1st Monday of each month; (20) parties are directed to use the services of a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/21/21.(KJR)cc: COR,JC,D
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pabon, Heather)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: GRANTING Atty Rheanne D. Falkner's #19 Motion to Substitute Atty Heather Gwinn Pabon is place of herself as counsel for Gill Industries, Inc.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/19/21. (KJR)cc: COR
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RENEWED MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gill Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pabon, Heather). Modified text on 4/19/2021 (KJR).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Parties' #17 Proposed Agreed Order, docketed as a motion is DENIED. Parties are directed to file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan, including all information listed in the Court's 03/18/2021 Order on or before 04/21/2021. Failure to do so will result in entry of a Scheduling Order without further input from the parties. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 04/14/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposed Agreed Order / Agreed Scheduling Order by Gill Industries, Inc.. (Pabon, Heather)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: DENYING without prejudice Atty Rheanne Falkner's #15 Motion to Substitute Party for Gill Industries, Inc.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/7/21. (KJR)cc: COR
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: re #15 MOTION to Substitute Party by Gill Industries, Inc. Motion to Substitute Attorney of Record (KJR)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Party by Gill Industries, Inc. Motion to Substitute Attorney of Record (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pabon, Heather)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 VIRTUAL ORDER: GRANTING dfts' #13 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically - that receipt ending in number 7264 shall be refunded in the amount of $402.00. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/22/21. (KJR)cc: COR, Finance
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF FEE REFUND APPROVED re 14 Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically ; the fee transaction involving Receipt No. 0643-4917264 having been erroneously paid, the Clerk APPROVES the refund by processing a credit through the electronic credit card system. The credit refund transaction in the amount of $402.00 was successfully completed on 3/23/21 at 9:53 am. cc: COR (KJR)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF FEE REFUND APPROVED re 12 Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically; the fee transaction involving Receipt No. 0643-4917220 having been erroneously paid, the Clerk APPROVES the refund by processing a credit through the electronic credit card system. The credit refund transaction in the amount of $402.00 was successfully completed on 3/23/21 at 9:55 am. cc: COR (KJR)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically as to Pamela Bagley Webb (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falkner, Rheanne)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 VIRTUAL ORDER: GRANTING dfts' #11 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically - that receipt number 643-4917220 shall be refunded in the amount of $402.00. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/18/21. (KJR)cc: COR, Finance. Modified text on 3/23/2021 (KJR).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically as to Heather Gwinn Pabon (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falkner, Rheanne)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) parties meet w/in 30 days; (2) exchange disclosures; (3) Rule 26 Meeting Report due 10 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/18/21.(KJR)cc: COR, US Mail to Attys Pabon, Webb, Gerken (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2021: #1 Consent Form) (KJR).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gill Industries, Inc.. (Falkner, Rheanne)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Gill Industries, Inc..(Falkner, Rheanne)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #4 MOTION for Heather Gwinn Pabon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918309), #6 MOTION for Samantha Gerken to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918431), #5 MOTION for Pamela Bagley Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918401). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/11/2021. (KM)cc: CORand Heather Gwinn Pabon, Pamela Bagley Webb, Samantha Gerken by US Mail with ECF Registration Form
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order BAR STATUS Check completed as to Heather Gwinn Pabon, Samantha Gerken, Pamela Bagley Webb re #4 MOTION for Heather Gwinn Pabon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918309), #6 MOTION for Samantha Gerken to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918431), #5 MOTION for Pamela Bagley Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918401). (KM) Modified text on 3/12/2021 (KM).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Samantha Gerken to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918431) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Falkner, Rheanne)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Pamela Bagley Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918401) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Falkner, Rheanne)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Heather Gwinn Pabon to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gill Industries, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4918309) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Falkner, Rheanne) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (KJR).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (JER)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Gill Industries, Inc.. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Rheanne Dodson Falkner without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JER)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison Circuit Court, case number 21-ci-037. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4917223), filed by Gill Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Gill Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Rheanne D. Falkner
Represented By: Pamela Bagley Webb
Represented By: Samantha C. Gerken
Represented By: Heather Gwinn Pabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Walters
Represented By: Justin Peterson
Represented By: Kellie Marie Collins
Represented By: Taylor Margaret Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?