Eusner v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Paul Eusner
Defendant: William Ellis Sullivan and Erin M. Sullivan
Case Number: 5:2021cv00074
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Change Venue filed by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan. (Getty, Richard) Modified Text/Add link on 4/30/2021 (MDC).
April 30, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Richard A. Getty re #9 REPLY: Error: a link was created to the Response instead of the Motion; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to the Motion, thereby placing the reply on the Judges motion report. In the future, create a link to the subject motion. The appropriate event is Reply to Response to Motion. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (MDC)
April 30, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION to Change Venue by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan (MDC)
April 19, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #7 Answer to Amended Complaint (MDC)
April 16, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan filed by Paul Eusner. (Attachments: #1 May 15, 2020 Listing Agreement, #2 August 6, 2020 Offer to Purchase, #3 February 5, 2021 Deed, #4 March 31, 2021 Order denying, #5 Georgia Eusner Grigor Affidavit, #6 Larry Anderson Affidavit, #7 Proposed Order)(Redford, Carroll)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan.(Getty, Richard)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Dfts accepted service of process through their counsel and were thereby properly served on 03/19/2021; and 2) Dfts SHALL FILE their answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint NLT 04/20/2021. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 04/05/2021. (MDC) cc: COR
April 5, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #5 Proposed Agreed Order by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan (MDC)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan. (Getty, Richard) Modified Filers on 4/5/2021 (MDC).
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A Affidavit of Ellis Sullivan, #4 Exhibit B Affidavit of Erin Sullivan, #5 Exhibit C Redacted Stalking Order documents, #6 Exhibit D Termination Letter, #7 Exhibit E Affidavit of Paul Eusner, #8 Exhibit F Proposed Lease)(Getty, Richard)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Eusner. (Forester, William)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette County Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-542. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4925185), filed by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fayette Circuit Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in Fayette Circuit Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MDC)
March 19, 2021 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan, filed by Paul Eusner. *FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 . (MDC)
March 19, 2021 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
March 19, 2021 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Venue by Erin M. Sullivan, William Ellis Sullivan. *FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 . (MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eusner v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ellis Sullivan
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: David Thomas Faughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin M. Sullivan
Represented By: Richard A. Getty
Represented By: David Thomas Faughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Eusner
Represented By: Carroll M. Redford, III
Represented By: Thomas Walcutt Miller
Represented By: Elizabeth Catesby Woodford
Represented By: William Todd Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?