Silverlo Enterprises LLC v. Lexington Laser Hair Removal, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Silverlo Enterprises LLC a Kentucky limited liability company doing business as Kentucky Laser Hair Removal
Defendant: Ryan Holland, Ashley Holland and Lexington Laser Hair Removal, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00120
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #13 AMENDED Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (JLM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Silverlo Enterprises LLC (Rosene, Peter) Modified on 6/14/2021 (JLM).
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding cc: form e-mailed to Register. (Attachments: #1 Order of Dismissal)(JLM)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. 1. Plaintiff Silverlo Enterprises LLC's motion for a preliminary injunction [RecordNo. #3 ] is DENIED, as moot. 2. Plaintiff Silverlo Enterprises LLC's claims asserted against Defendants Lexington Laser Hair Removal, LLC, Ashley Holland, and Ryan Holland are DISMISSED, without prejudice. 3. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket. 4. The parties shall bear their respective costs, attorney's fees, and expenses. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/08/21.(JLM)cc: COR
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Silverlo Enterprises LLC (Rosene, Peter)
June 7, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (JLM)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ashley Holland, Lexington Laser Hair Removal, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 summons)(JLM)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Silverlo Enterprises LLC Additional Summons (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons - Lexington Laser, #2 Attachment Summons - Ashley Holland, #3 Attachment Summons - Ryan Holland)(Rosene, Peter)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form e-mailed to Register. (JER)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ryan Holland; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JER) Modified text on 5/7/2021 (JER).
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Silverlo Enterprises LLC. (JER)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #3 filed by Silverlo Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Declaration of Mark Silverthorn, #2 Exhibit -1 to Declaration of Mark Silverthorn, #3 Exhibit -2 to Declaration of Mark Silverthorn, #4 Exhibit -3 to Declaration of Mark Silverthorn, #5 Exhibit -4 to Declaration of Mark Silverthorn, #6 Exhibit -5 to Declaration of Mark Silverthorn, #7 Exhibit -6 to Declaration of Mark Silverthorn)(JER)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Silverlo Enterprises LLC (JER) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (JER).
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4965774), filed by Silverlo Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)
May 6, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)
May 6, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Silverlo Enterprises LLC (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverlo Enterprises LLC v. Lexington Laser Hair Removal, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silverlo Enterprises LLC a Kentucky limited liability company doing business as Kentucky Laser Hair Removal
Represented By: Peter J. Rosene
Represented By: Bruce Benjamin Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Laser Hair Removal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?