Esenbock v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Harry Esenbock
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00121
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Harry Esenbock OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS (Shultz, Tanner)
June 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (McNeill, John) Modified on 6/14/2021 (JLM).
June 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE re: Initial Disclosures served on Plaintiff by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (McNeill, John) Modified on 6/11/2021 (JLM).
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Harry Esenbock OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Shultz, Tanner)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: (Discovery) (1) initial disclosures shall be exchange by 6/9/21; Discovery due by 10/30/2021; (2) parties shall observe the directives in this order re filing discovery materials; (3) discovery disputes shall be resolved as directed in this order; (Dispositive Motions) Amended Pleadings & Motion to Join Additional Parties due by pla by 7/20/21 - dft by 8/17/2021; Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 3/15/2022; (Pretrial) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/5/2022 at 01:30 PM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove; by 6/24/22 counsel shall file witness & exhibit lists; Pretrial Filings due 10 days prior to Final PTC; JURY TRIAL set for 7/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove; counsel arrive at 9:30 am; extension of time shall be submitted upon motion; case REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for purpose of discovery & PT proceedings. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/8/21.(KJR)cc: COR,Fkt Diary
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McNeill, John)
June 7, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLM)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) NLT 30 days from the date of entry of this order, parties shall conduct meeting of parties to discuss the possibilities of prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan; 2. At the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures and, in the future, make supplemental disclosures when required; 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, the parties shall file a joint written report outlining the proposed discovery plan; 4. In the event this matter involves a corporation or partnership, the party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the parties' joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/10/21. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLM)cc: COR
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. That Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. is a privately held California corporation and is not publicly traded. (MDC)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette County Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-1056. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4965838), filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Petition for Removal filed in Fayette Circuit Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment State Court Complaint, #4 Attachment State Court Answer)(MDC)
May 6, 2021 Conflict Check run. (MDC)
May 6, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (MDC)
May 6, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 . (MDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esenbock v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Esenbock
Represented By: Tanner H. Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?