vanHouten et al v. Kentucky Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Fulz, Russell Clemons, Anthony Harvey, Daniel Dunaway, Gary Bancroft, Iri Harkness, Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten, Brandon Lannum, Ethan Reid, Hodor, Sigmund, James Mark Dunn, Alaska, Tommy Fletcher, Sorli, KID, Josh Roberts, Klein Bart, Glenn Summitt, Sinfjotli, Kevin Rowe, Helgi, Stephen Harkness and B.T.
Defendant: Core Civic, Janet Conover, Kentucky Department of Corrections, Alicia Boyd, Cookie Crews, Daniel Akers and Lee Adjustment Center
Case Number: 5:2021cv00153
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: 1. vanHouten's #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; 2. The $52 administrative fee is WAIVED; 3. The Clerk of Court shall update the docket sheet to reflect that vanHouten is the sole remaining plaintiff in this matter; 4. vanHouten must immediately advise the Clerk's office of any further change to his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case; 5. The Court will perform the initial screening of this matter. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/26/2021.(KM)cc: COR and Lifseyfind Reinier vanHouten
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Request for Religious Meals, #3 Exhibit B-Memorandum, #4 Exhibit C-Request for ID Change, #5 Exhibit D-Letter from CoreCivic, #6 Exhibit E-Inmate Grievance Form, #7 Exhibit F-Inmate Request, #8 Exhibit G-Request for Accommodation, #9 Exhibit H-Request for Accommodation, #10 Exhibit I-Inmate Grievance Form, #11 Exhibit J-Inmate Grievance Form, #12 Envelope bearing 7/13/2021 postmark)(JER)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JER)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten. (JER) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2021: #1 6 month average income statement) (JER).
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten (Attachments: #1 Envelope bearing no postmark)(JER)
July 16, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten, ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten, #11 Amended Complaint,, (JER)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff vanHouten's #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; 2. Plaintiff vanHouten's #5 MOTION for class certification is DENIED; 3. The Clerk of Court shall send vanHouten a copy of the Court's civil rights complaint form [Form EDKY 520]. Consistent with the guidance set forth above, (a) vanHouten must file a new complaint specific only to his own claims under the United States Constitution and/or RLUIPA, or (b) the Plaintiffs may join together in their claims if they do so properly under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 4. vanHouten and/or the rest of the co-plaintiff file this amended complaint within 30 days; and 5. Any plaintiff whose claims are not properly joined with vanHouten's but who nevertheless wish to seek relief in federal court may obtain his own complaint form from the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 6/22/2021.(KM)cc: CORand Lifseyvind Reiner vanHouten by US Mail with Form EDKY 520
June 3, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Filing)(JER)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten Motions referred to P SO. (JER)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten Motions referred to P SO. (JER) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/3/2021) (STC).
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of #1 filed by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten. (JER) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/3/2021) (STC).
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED) filed by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Request for accommodation, #2 Exhibit B-CoreCivic response, #3 Exhibit C-Request for KOMS change, #4 Exhibit D-Response re Request for change, #5 Exhibit E-Grievance form, #6 Exhibit F-Request for components, #7 Exhibit G-Request for accommodation, #8 Exhibit H-Request for accommodtion, #9 Exhibit I-Grievance form, #10 Exhibit J-Grievance form, #11 Letter to Clerk, #12 Envelope bearing 5/28/2021 postmark)(JER)
June 2, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten, #5 MOTION to Certify Class by Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: vanHouten et al v. Kentucky Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bancroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iri Harkness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifseyvind Reinier vanHouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lannum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hodor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigmund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mark Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sorli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klein Bart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Summitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinfjotli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helgi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Harkness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.T.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Civic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Conover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cookie Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Adjustment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?