Dening v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pamela Dening
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00221
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) dft shall file the administrative record by 11/5/21. The Court GRANTS the defendant's request to file the administrative record under seal. Pla's objections due by 11/19/21; (2) Amended Pleadings & Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 11/26/21; (3) pla discovery due by 12/6/21; (4) dft shall (i) respond to the proposed disc or (ii) notify pla in writing that the pla is not entitled to conduct the proposed disc, or that all or a portion of the proposed disc is outside the bounds of disc permitted in a claim seeking the recovery of an ERISA benefit by no later than 1/7/22; (5) should parties be unable to agree re proposed disc, pla shall file any motion by 1/14/22; (6) by 2/18/22, parties shall file motions for jgmt, or if any motions re: discovery remain pending, w/in 60 days after resolution of disc motions and the close of disc; (7) response due w/in 30 days after parties motions; (8) reply briefs due w/in 15 days after parties file response briefs; (9) parties may request oral argument by separate motion or through their briefs. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/04/21.(JLM)cc: COR
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
September 29, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #9 Answer to Complaint (JLM)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , Aetna Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(von Schleicher, Warren)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: granting #7 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company shall have until September 28, 2021, in which to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/01/21. (JLM)cc: COR
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order and Stipulation for Additional Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
August 25, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Warren von Schleicher re #4 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5050206). (JLM)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Within 30 days counsel shall conduct Rule 26(f) meeting to discuss settlement or develop discovery plan. 2) At meeting counsel shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures, and in the future make Rule 26(e) disclosures. 3) NLT 10 dys after meeting counsel shall file a written joint report outlining discovery plan. Parties should contemplate trial date within 12 months or less. The report shall include details expanded upon in body of this order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 08/24/2021.(JER)cc: COR (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2021: #1 MJ Consent Form) (JER).
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 VIRTUAL ORDER: GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 08/24/2021. (JER)cc: COR
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Warren Sebastian von Schleicher to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5050206) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Warren Sebastian von Schleicher, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Aetna Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company.. (JER)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Circuit Court, case number 21-ci-327. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5050068), filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)
August 24, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dening v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Dening
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Thornsbury
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?