Salters v. Paul
Petitioner: Eldred Salters
Respondent: Warden David Paul
Case Number: 5:2021cv00247
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eldred Salters re #4 Order Dismissing Case. (JER)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eldred Salters re #3 Pro Se Information Packet. (JER)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) Salter's #1 petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DENIED without prejudice, and this specific action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 2) That said, Salters may file a new habeas petition with this Court regarding the matters he raised. 3) The Clerk's Office shall send Salters (a) Petition for a Write of Habeas Corpus Form; (b) Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; (c) Certificate of Inmate Account Form. 4) If Salters wants to start a new case, Salters must complete the E.D. Ky. 521 Form, sign it, and file it with this Court. At the same time, Salters must also complete and file both the AO 240 and E.D. Ky. 523 Forms, or, alternatively, he must pay the $5.00 filing fee or at least submit a copy of a completed BP-199 Form that he filed with prison officials requesting that the prison withdraw funds from his inmate account to pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/13/2021. (MDC) cc: COR and Eldred Salters by US Mail (Order + Forms)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Filing)(JER)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Eldred Salters. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope bearing illegible postmark)(JER)
October 7, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (JER)
October 7, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salters v. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eldred Salters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden David Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?