Guarino v. Northwood Marine Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Tracy Guarino
Defendant: Northwood Marine Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00261
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Parties conduct meeting w/in 21 days; 2) 10 days after meeting file joint report; 3) advise Court regarding corporate disclosures. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/24/21.(JLM)cc: COR
November 23, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: #9 Answer to Complaint (JLM)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Northwood Marine Services, LLC.(Herre, Robert)
November 17, 2021 Attorney Update. Attorney Medrith Lee Norman for Tracy Guarino added. Attorney Janine Tate Webb terminated. (JLM)
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Tracy Guarino of Substitution of Counsel (Norman, Medrith)
November 11, 2021 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northwood Marine Services, LLC. (Herre, Robert)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert P. Herre. #5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE has been filed by Northwood Marine Services, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLM)
November 9, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Robert Herre: It appears the address listed on your filing #5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JLM)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Northwood Marine Services, LLC. (Herre, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Guarino via Constable to Northwood Marine Services, LLC served on 10/23/2021, answer due 11/15/2021. (Webb, Janine)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Northwood Marine Services, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JER)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5099862), filed by Tracy Guarino. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)
October 14, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guarino v. Northwood Marine Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Guarino
Represented By: Janine Tate Webb
Represented By: Medrith Lee Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwood Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Herre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?