Wells v. Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC et al
Defendant: Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC and Sam's West, Inc.
Executor: Estelle Wells
Case Number: 5:2021cv00269
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anna Deener on behalf of All Defendants (Deener, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC COMPLETED on 12/7/2021. Secretary of State return states Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested. (Attachments: #1 Secretary of State Letter)(JER)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Sam's West, Inc. Secretary of State return states Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested. (Attachments: #1 Secretary of State Letter)(JER) Modified on 12/14/2021 (STC).
November 29, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells: SERVICE to SECRETARY OF STATE. (JER) Modified on 11/29/2021 (STC).
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: 1. Within 21 days counsel shall meet; 2. Within 10 days after meeting the parties shall file a joint status report; 3. Each party is directed to advise the Court of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members, and/or partners. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/24/2021.(KM)cc: COR and Jennifer Schell by US mail. Modified text on 11/24/2021 (KM).
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sam's West, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Sam's West, Inc... (Taylor, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #12 MOTION for William D. Marler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125551), #13 MOTION for Bruce T. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125591), #14 MOTION for Jennifer B. Schell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125615). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 11/17/2021. (KM)cc: COR and Bruce T. Clark, Jennifer B. Schell, William D. Marler by US Mail
November 17, 2021 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Bruce T. Clark, William D. Marler, Jennifer B. Schell re #12 MOTION for William D. Marler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125551), #13 MOTION for Bruce T. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125591), #14 MOTION for Jennifer B. Schell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125615). (KJR)
November 17, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to William D. Marler, Bruce T. Clark, Jennifer B. Schell re 15 Virtual Order. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to William D. Marler, Bruce T. Clark, Jennifer B. Schell (KM)
November 17, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #12 MOTION for William D. Marler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125551), #13 MOTION for Bruce T. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125591), #14 MOTION for Jennifer B. Schell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125615) (KJR)
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Jennifer B. Schell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125615) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Colson, Guy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Bruce T. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125591) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Colson, Guy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for William D. Marler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Estelle Wells, Estelle Wells ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5125551) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Colson, Guy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Sam's West, Inc. to be served through the Secretary of State; summons returned to plaintiff by US Mail. (KJR)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Estelle Wells as to Sam's West, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons NEW SUMMONS TO BE REISSUED UPON SAM'S WEST INC.)(Colson, Guy) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (KJR).
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY William D. Marler by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (KM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Bruce T. Clark by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (KM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jeffrey Taylor. #5 Answer to Complaint has been filed by Sam's West, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KM)
November 10, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #5 Answer to Complaint (KM)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Harry Finance Inc. for Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC.. (Taylor, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC, Sam's West, Inc..(Taylor, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED by Estelle Wells: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to All Defendants. (JER)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Kentucky Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Summons -Sam's)(JER)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5105831), filed by Estelle Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order Probating Will and Appointing Executrix, #2 Summons -Fresh Foods, #3 Summons -Sam's, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JER)
October 22, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Executor: Estelle Wells
Represented By: Christopher G. Colson
Represented By: Guy R. Colson
Represented By: William D. Marler
Represented By: Bruce T. Clark
Represented By: Jennifer B. Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Foods of Washington, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?