Kyrkanides v. Capilouto et al
Plaintiff: Stephanos Kyrkanides
Defendant: Eli Capilouto, G. Thomas Kluemper, Jeffrey P. Okeson and William E. Thro
Case Number: 5:2021cv00270
Filed: October 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by G. Thomas Kluemper, Jeffrey P. Okeson, William E. Thro , #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Eli Capilouto filed by Stephanos Kyrkanides. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss)(Roberts, H.)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Eli Capilouto (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Andrew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by G. Thomas Kluemper, Jeffrey P. Okeson, William E. Thro (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Andrew)
October 25, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JER)
October 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants ; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons -Kluemper, #2 Summons -Okeson, #3 Summons -Thro)(JER)
October 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5107055), filed by Stephanos Kyrkanides. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Memorandum to Capilouto of 4/20/2021, #2 Exhibit B-Email to Okeson of 4/22/2020, #3 Exhibit C-Email to Lineberry of 4/22/2020, #4 Exhibit D-Email to Kyrkanides of 1/16/2021, #5 Exhibit E-Email to Kluemper of 1/17/2021, #6 Exhibit F-Email to Richardson of 1/18/2021, #7 Exhibit G-Email from Kyrkanides of 1/19/2021, #8 Exhibit H-Email to Kyrkanides of 1/28/2021, #9 Exhibit I-Email to Okeson and Lineberry of 2/10/2021, #10 Exhibit J-Email from Kyrkanides of 2/16/2021, #11 Exhibit K-Email from Thro of 3/2/2019, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons -Capilouto, #14 Summons -Kluemper, #15 Summons -Okeson, #16 Summons -Thro)(JER)
October 23, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO UPDATE ADDRESS to Amanda Virginia Lawson: It appears the address listed on your filing #1 Complaint, is different than the address registered with our Court. Pursuant to the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures governing ECF, a request to update your address must be processed through your PACER account. Please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information or contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR (JER)
October 23, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Amanda Lawson and H. Wayne Roberts re #1 Complaint; Error: Attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A, Exhibit B. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyrkanides v. Capilouto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanos Kyrkanides
Represented By: Amanda Virginia Lawson
Represented By: H. Wayne Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Capilouto
Represented By: Andrew Robinson Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Thomas Kluemper
Represented By: Andrew Robinson Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P. Okeson
Represented By: Andrew Robinson Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Thro
Represented By: Andrew Robinson Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?