Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Lexmark International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Lexmark International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00110
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Lexmark International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Reid; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amy E. Simpson. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/20/22. (JLM)cc: COR
May 20, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Amy E. Simpson re #19 MOTION for Amy E. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270251). (KM)
May 20, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #19 MOTION for Amy E. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270251), #18 MOTION for Joseph P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270215) (KM)
May 20, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Joseph P. Reid re #18 MOTION for Joseph P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270215). (KM)
May 20, 2022 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Joseph P. Reid and Amy E. Simpson: re 20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Joseph P. Reid and Amy E. Simpson (JLM)
May 19, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Amy E. Simpson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270251) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
May 19, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Joseph P. Reid to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lexmark International, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5270215) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Loy, Steven)
May 11, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Amy E. Simpson by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (KJR)
May 11, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Joseph P. Reid by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (KJR)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #8 Proposed Agreed Order: It is ORDERED that Defendant Lexmark International, Inc is granted an extension of time and SHALL HAVE up to and including 7/13/2022 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/11/2022.(KM)cc: COR
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the #12 Motion for Charles Austin Ginnings to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #13 Motion for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by plaintiff Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. and GRANTED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/10/2022. (KM)cc: COR
May 11, 2022 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Timothy E. Grochocinski, Charles Austin Ginnings re #13 MOTION for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5263058), #12 MOTION for C. Austin Ginnings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. (Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5262985). (KM)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Timothy E. Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5263058) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State of Illinois, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Northern District of Illinois, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grochocinski, Timothy)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for C. Austin Ginnings to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5262985) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State of NY, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Southern District of New York, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ginnings, Charles)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECUSAL ORDER: The undersigned RECUSES form the civil actions. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to reassign these related matters in accordance with General Order 21-14. (Randomly reassigned to Judge Caldwell). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/10/2022.(KM)cc: COR
May 10, 2022 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Loy, Steven)
May 10, 2022 Conflict Check run. (KM)
May 2, 2022 Conflict Check run. (JER)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James M. Francis, Timothy E. Grochocinski, and Charles Austin Ginnings. #1 Complaint, has been filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JER)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Timothy E. Grochocinski by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1, 83.2 and forms)(JER)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Charles Austin Ginnings by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2 (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1, 83.2 and forms)(JER)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lexmark International, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JER)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint, cc: form e-mailed to Register. (JER)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5255062), filed by Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US9965233, #2 Exhibit 2-US10642576, #3 Exhibit 3-US10846031, #4 Exhibit 4-USRE42725, #5 Exhibit 5-Claims Chart for US9965233, #6 Exhibit 6-Claims Chart for US10642576, #7 Exhibit 7-Claims Chart for US 10846031, #8 Exhibit 8-Claims Chart for USRE42725, #9 Exhibit 9-Columbian Article, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Summons)(JER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flexiworld Technologies, Inc. v. Lexmark International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flexiworld Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Austin Ginnings
Represented By: James M. Francis
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexmark International, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Simpson
Represented By: Joseph P. Reid
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?