Young v. SSA
Plaintiff: Deanna Young
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 5:2022cv00207
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
August 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deanna Young via Certified Mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 8/19/2022. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Certified Mail on 08/17/2022; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via Certified Mail on 08/22/2022. (MDC)
August 12, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (Attachments: #1 Summons -USAG, #2 Summons -USAO)(JER) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2022: #3 Receipt) (JER).
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2) Ptf. may proceed w/out payment of costs or fees.. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 08/11/2022. (JER)cc: COR
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deanna Young (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SAM)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Deanna Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney, #3 Summons SSA, #4 Summons Attorney General)(SAM)
August 11, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Boom for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deanna Young (SAM)
August 11, 2022 Conflict Check run. (SAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Young
Represented By: Amber Brahm Eubank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?