Dawson v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.
Petitioner: Jennifer S. Dawson
Respondent: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. All Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. All claims against the Defendant being resolved, this matter is DISMISSED and STRIKCEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/5/2024. (KMP) cc: COR
February 29, 2024 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #8 Stipulation of Dismissal (KMP)
February 28, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Jennifer S. Dawson, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc. (Blankenship, Stacey) Modified to add filers on 2/29/2024 (KMP).
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER:The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to file a joint stipulation of dismissal within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/31/2024.(KCF)cc: COR
January 30, 2024 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (KMP)
January 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer S. Dawson (Blankenship, Stacey)
January 29, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.. (Kennedy, Katherine)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/9/2024. (KMP) cc: COR Modified referral and text on 1/10/2024 (KMP).
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION to Perpetuate Testimony of Sedgwick Claims Management, Inc..( Filing fee $52; receipt number AKYEDC-5735664), filed by Jennifer S. Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John B. Flood, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(KMP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2024: #1 Declaration of John B. Flood, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (KMP).
January 8, 2024 Conflict Check run. (KMP)
January 8, 2024 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove for review: #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony, (KMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jennifer S. Dawson
Represented By: Stacey A. Blankenship
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc.
Represented By: Katherine L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?