Stidham v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael A. Stidham
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2025cv00022
Filed: January 30, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. parties conduct Rule 26(f) meeting in 30 days; 2. at time of meeting, exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; 3. file written joint report no later than 10 days after meeting re proposed discovery plan, consent form attached; 4. corporation or partnership party directed to advise court of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 3/6/2025. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(STC)cc: COR
February 4, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #4 Answer to Complaint (KM)
February 3, 2025 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Rice, Eric)
January 30, 2025 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Insurance Company.. (Howell, Ashley)
January 30, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 25-CI-11. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6022488), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, Ashley)
January 30, 2025 Conflict Check run. (Howell, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stidham v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Stidham
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Represented By: Bartley K. Hagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric S. Rice
Represented By: Daniel S. Gumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?