Holt v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Tammy Holt
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 5:2025cv00042
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/10/2025. (KMP) cc: COR
March 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Counsel exchange info by 5/31/2025. Motions to join addt'l parties or amend pleadings due by ptff nlt 9/30/2025 and by def nlt 10/31/2025. Supplementation/Responses not be filed in the record. Expert trial witnesses: ptff by 3/31/2026, def by 5/29/2026. Fact discovery due 2/27/2026, expert discovery due 7/31/2026. Dispositive/Daubert motions due 8/31/2026; 2. No motions to compel, nor any other motions relating to a discovery dispute, shall be filed; 3. Parties shall observe directives re the filing of discovery materials; 4. No extensions of deadlines shall be granted w/out an appropriate motion filed prior to expiration of deadline in question; 5. TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/1/2027 at 02:30 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell; 6. JURY TRIAL set for 2/16/2027 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. counsel to be present by 8:30 a.m. Court will set aside 3 days for trial; 7. Matter referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/10/2025. (KMP) cc: COR,JC,D
March 7, 2025 Filing 5 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Banks, Darrin)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days from the date of service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting required by FRCP 26(f); 2. NLT 14 days after the meeting, counsel shall file a written joint report. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/19/2025.(KM)cc: COR
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure)(KMP)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Madison Circuit Court, case number 25-CI-42. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6034854), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit State Farm Letter to Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMP)
February 18, 2025 Conflict Check run. (KMP)
February 18, 2025 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. FILED IN STATE COURT RECORD. SEE #1 . (KMP)
February 18, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, (KMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Holt
Represented By: Michael Stanley Goeing
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Goeing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Laura Fayth Disney
Represented By: Darrin Winn Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?