Smith v. Holler Crawlers Off-Road Club, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joey Smith
Defendant: Holler Crawlers Off-Road Club, Inc., Asher Land and Mineral, LLLP, Asher Coal Mining Company, Albey Brock, Rick Cornett, Hubert Dozier, Lonnie Maiden, Jr., Coye Silcox, Andy Williams, Jon Grace, Yamaha Corporation of America, Harold Brock, Bill Partin and Yamaha Motor Coporation, USA
Case Number: 6:2013cv00200
Filed: October 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: London Office
County: Bell
Presiding Judge: Karen K. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION & ORDER: For all the reasons as stated within the order, the Court finds that Holler Crawlers is immune from liability under the Recreational Use Statute and hereby ORDERS that its motion for summary judgment (DE 75 ) is GRANTED and all of the plaintiff's claims against Holler Crawlers are DISMISSED. The Court further hereby ORDERS that the joint motion for oral argument (DE 77 ) is DENIED. The Court has ruled on this motion and the motions for summary judgment filed by defendants Jon Grace and Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA and none of these motions required a hearing. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/6/2015.(MRS)cc: COR
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION & ORDER: For reasons as stated herein, the motions for summary judgment by Jon Grace, in his individual capacity, and Yamaha Motor Corporation (DE 48 , 56 ) are GRANTED and all claims against these defendants are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/5/2015.(MRS)cc: COR
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION & ORDER: The motion for summary judgment by Asher Land and Mineral, LLLP and Asher Coal Mining Company (DE 27 ) is GRANTED and all claims against these defendants are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/25/14.(SYD)cc: COR
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION & ORDER: 1) the motion to dismiss (DE 21 ) by the individual defendants in their individual and official capacities is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: a) the motion is GRANTED as to the defendants Albey Brock in his individu al and official capacities, Rick Cornett in his individual and official capacities, Harold Brock in his individual and official capacities, Lonnie Maiden, Jr. in his individual and official capacities, Coyle Silcox in his individual and official cap acities, and Bill Partin in his individual and official capacities and all claims against these defendants are DISMISSED; b) the motion is GRANTED as to Jon Grace in his official capacity and all claims against this defendant in his official capacity are DISMISSED; and c) the motion is DENIED as to Jon Grace in his individual capacity; 2) the plaintiffs motion for order permitting additional support (DE 30 ) is GRANTED. The Court notes that it is the plaintiff's obligation to specifically point out relevant facts and legal arguments contained in the attachments that he would like the Court to consider in resolving any motions in this matter. The Court is not required to comb through these documents to find facts and legal arguments t hat may be favorable to the plaintiff; and 3) the plaintiffs motion (DE 36 ) to cite additional authority is GRANTED. Harold Brock (Individually), Harold Brock, Rick Cornett, Rick Cornett (Bell County Magistrate), Jon Grace, Lonnie Maiden, Jr (Bell County Magistrate), Lonnie Maiden, Jr, Bill Partin, Coye Silcox (Bell County Magistrate), Coye Silcox, Albey Brock (County Judge Executive) and Albey Brock terminated. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/14.(SYD)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Holler Crawlers Off-Road Club, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Smith
Represented By: W. Patrick Hauser
Represented By: William A. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holler Crawlers Off-Road Club, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Floyd Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher Land and Mineral, LLLP
Represented By: Timothy C. Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asher Coal Mining Company
Represented By: Timothy C. Feld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albey Brock
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Cornett
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Dozier
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Maiden, Jr.
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coye Silcox
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Williams
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Grace
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Brock
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Partin
Represented By: Jane Winkler Dyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Coporation, USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?