Adams v. Cunnagin et al

Plaintiff: Darrell Wayne Adams
Defendant: Rhonda Jones, Carrie Cunnagin, Jennifer West, King and Mitchell Dyre
Case Number: 6:2018cv00235
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Clerk's Note: The Telephonic Conference Minutes (formerly DE 9) entered 10/30/2018 were entered in error and the entry was deleted by the docket clerk. (RBB)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Carrie Cunnagin, Mitchell Dyre, Rhonda Jones, King, Jennifer West, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2018: #1 USM Receipt stamped 10/30/2018) (KJA).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. For admin purposes, the Clerk shall add "Defendant King" as a dft in this action. 2/ W/in 21 days from entry of this Order, Adams is to provide the Court w/info that would enable the marshals to identify "Defendant King" for the marshals to attempt service. 3. The Clerk shall prepare (5) "Service Packets" for service upon the USA an dfts Carrie Cunnagin, Rhonda Jones, Jennifer West, and Mitchell Dyre. 4. Clerk shall deliver the Service Packets to the USMS in Lexington and note the date of delivery in the docket. 5. USMS shall serve the USA by sending a Service Packet by certified or registered mail to Civil Process Clerk at US Attorney EDKy; and Attorney General of the US in Wahsington, D.C. 6. USMS shall personally serve dfts Cunnagin, Jones, West, and Dyre at USP-McCreary in Pine Knot thru arrangement w/FBOP. 7. Adams must advise Clerk of any change in his current mailing address. 8. If Adams wishes to seek relief from the Court, he must do so by filing a formal motion sent to the Clerk's Office. Every motion must include written certification of service. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/29/2018.(KJA)cc: COR, Pro Se Filer via US Mail
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Adamss motion for extension of time [R. 3] is GRANTED.2. The Clerk of the Court shall CREDIT the $200.00 already received from Adamsin Adams v. Cunnigan, et al., No. 6:18-cv-83-GFVT (E.D. Ky.) against the filing fees due in this action. 3. Adams must make the remaining payment of $200.00 towards the filing fee due in this action to the Clerk of the Court on or before Thursday, October 18, 2018. The Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute if payment is not timely made. 4. This case stands submitted for initial screening as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Darrell Wayne Adams filed by Darrell Wayne Adams. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/18/2018.(RBB)cc: COR, finance, pro se pary Darrell Wayne Adams, via US Mail.
September 10, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Darrell Wayne Adams (KJA)
September 10, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time Styled as a Letter by Darrell Wayne Adams, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (KJA) Modified to state mailing envelope attached at DE #1 on 9/10/2018 (KJA).
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge, filed by Darrell Wayne Adams, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Various Attachments, #3 Cover Letter, #4 mailing envelope, front and back, postmark illegible)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Cunnagin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Wayne Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Cunnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Dyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?