Gonzalez v. Shelton
Plaintiff: Sadiel Gonzalez
Defendant: Tommy W. Shelton
Case Number: 6:2018cv00265
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sadiel Gonzalez filed by Sadiel Gonzalez: 1. The Court DENIES DE 7; 2. Within 30 days of this Order, Gonzalez SHALL pay the $400.00 in filing and administrative fees to the Clerk of the Court. The Court will dismiss this matter without prejudice for failure to prosecute if Plaintiff fails to timely remit payment.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 12/5/2018.(JMB)cc: COR, Sadiel Gonzalez via US Mail
December 3, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (KJA)
December 3, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sadiel Gonzalez (KJA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sadiel Gonzalez, pro se. ***Mailing envelope attached at DE #7 . (KJA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sadiel Gonzalez, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Copy of October 19, 2018 Order, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 11/28/2018)(KJA)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. The Court GRANTS Gonzalez's motion for an extension of time, DE #5 ; 2. As previously directed in the Courts October 19, 2018 Order, DE #4 , Gonzalez must either (a) pay the $400.00 in filing fees; or (b) have the Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523] that was previously sent to him by the Clerk of the Court certified by prison staff, complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application [Form AO-240], and file both of these documents with the Court. 3. Gonzalez must take these steps on or before Monday, December 3, 2018, or the Court will dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/7/2018.(KJA)cc: COR, mailed paper copy to pro se filer via US Mail
November 6, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Sadiel Gonzalez (JMB)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Sadiel Gonzalez, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - front and back; postmarked 10/31/2018)(JMB)(Note: Address updated as stated in letter)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : 1. The Clerk of the Court SHALL send Gonzalez AO240 and EDKY Form 523. 2. Gonzalex SHALL either pay or file forms. 3. Take one of these steps w/I 30 days. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 10/19/18. (Attachments: #1 AO 240, #2 EDKY 523)(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer w/forms
October 18, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
October 18, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Sadiel Gonzalez, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 mailng envelope, front and back, postmark unknown)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy W. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadiel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?