Solano-Moreta et al v. Kizziah et al
Plaintiff: Jorge J. Solano-Moreta and Landon Mason Price
Defendant: Linch, Captain Thompson, Cunnagin, Jones and Warden Kizziah
Case Number: 6:2018cv00293
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Landon Mason Price re #9 Order (SYD)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff Jorge Solano-Moretas motion to proceed in forma pauperis [R. 2] is GRANTED. 2. Within twenty-eight (28) days, Solano-Moreta must pay $14.83 to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Solano-Moretas name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525). The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form upon the warden of the institution in which Solano-Moreta is currently confined. 4. Each month Solano-Moretas custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of Solano-Moretas income. 5. Petitioner Solano-Moreta must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change to his current mailing address. 6. The pending motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Landon Mason Price [R. 4] is DENIED AS MOOT. 7. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/17/18. (Attachments: #1 EDKy 525) (SYD)cc: mailed with form to pro se filer and Warden; Finance. Added finance on 12/17/2018 (SYD).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #1 Complaint : 1. Claims one, two, three, four, five, six, and ten are DISMISSED; 2. Plaintiff Solano-Moretas claims seven and nine are SEVERED from Plaintiff Prices claims eight and eleven; 3. Claims seven and nine will proceed in the present action, Case No. 6:18-cv-00293-CHB, and the Court will address Solano-Moretas motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [R. #2 ] by subsequent Order; 4. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to open a new action wherein Plaintiff Price may pursue claims eight and eleven. The Clerk shall file a copy of the complaint in this matter [R. 1] as well as Prices motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and accompanying financial information [R. 4, R. 5] in the new action; 5. Prices motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [R. 4] will be addressed in the new action by subsequent Order. Landon Mason Price terminated. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/10/18.(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filers
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Landon Mason Price re #7 Pro Se Information Packet. (SYD)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filers via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Page)(SYD)
November 26, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria H. Boom for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jorge J. Solano-Moreta, #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Landon Mason Price (SYD)
November 26, 2018 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Landon Mason Price, PRO SE. (SYD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Landon Mason Price, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. (SYD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jorge J. Solano-Moreta, pro se. (SYD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jorge J. Solano-Moreta, PRO SE. Motions referred to P SO. (SYD)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jorge J. Solano-Moreta, PRO SE, Landon Mason Price, PRO SE, referred to Judge P SO. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 summons, #3 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 11/16/18)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solano-Moreta et al v. Kizziah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge J. Solano-Moreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Mason Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?