The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Delph et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Sarah Carta, Willie Bundy, Express Funeral Funding, LLC. and Velva Delph
Case Number: 6:2018cv00298
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (SYD)
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pullen, Andrew)
January 2, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #10 Order For Meeting and Report: Clerk regenerated DE #10 to COR for Sarah Carta who filed her answer on 12/28/2018 at DE #12 . (RBB)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sarah Carta.(Benge, Douglas)
December 27, 2018 Clerk's Note: re #10 Order For Meeting and Report: Clerk regenerated to COR for Willie Bundy who filed his answer on 12/26/18 at DE #11 . (MRS)
December 26, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Willie Bundy.(Richards, E.)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel shall meet pursuant to Rule 26(f)(2); 2) Within 14 days from the meeting parties shall file joint status report. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 Consent Form)(RC)cc: COR
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America via Process Server to Willie Bundy served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pullen, Andrew)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America via Process Server to Sarah Carta served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pullen, Andrew)
December 18, 2018 Attorney Update. Attorney Robert L. Roark for Velva Delph added. (RBB)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Velva Delph.(Richards, E.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America via Process Server to Express Funeral Funding, LLC. served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pullen, Andrew)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America via Process Server to Velva Delph served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pullen, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Willie Bundy, Sarah Carta, Velva Delph, Express Funeral Funding, LLC.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MRS)
November 26, 2018 Conflict Check run. (MRS)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (MRS)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4221639), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Proposed Summons _ Express Funeral, #4 Proposed Summons_Carta, #5 Proposed Summons_Delph, #6 Proposed Summons_Bundy)(MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Delph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Carta
Represented By: Douglas Glenn Benge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Bundy
Represented By: E. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Funeral Funding, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velva Delph
Represented By: E. Douglas Richards
Represented By: Robert L. Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Andrew Pullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?