Tracey v. Wayne County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Adam W. Tracey
Defendant: Jailer Harvey Shearer, Sheriff Tim Catron, John and Jane Does 1 through 10 and Wayne County Detention Center
Case Number: 6:2018cv00300
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE re #6 Order: EDKY 525 filed w/the Court indicating $0.00 is remitted with the form. Signed by Jail Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope postmarked 12-14-18)(MRS)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: 1) Tracey's 8th Amendment claim is DISMISSED w/PREJUDICE; 2) Any state law claims asserted by Tracey in this matter are DISMISSED w/OUT PREJUDICE; 3) Matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN; 4) This is a final and appealable jgm. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/11/18.(MRS)cc: COR, Pro Se filer
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Tracey's claim for a violation of his Eighth Amendment right to be free from cruel and unusual punishment is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 2) Any state law claims Tracey wishes to assert in this action are DISMISSED; 3) Matter is DISMISSED and STRICKEN; 4) Jgm shall be entered. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 12/11/18.(MRS)cc: COR, Pro Se Filer
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Petitioner's motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED; 2) Because of the lack of available assets in Tracey's acct, pymt of an initial filing fee is DEFERRED; 3) Clerk shall open an account in Tracey's name. Clerk complete a Ntc of Payment Form [EDKY 525]. Clerk serve a copy of this order & Ntc of Pymt Form upon the Wardent of the institution in which Tracey is confined; 4) Each month Tracey's custodian shall send the Clerk a pyment in an amt equal to 20% of Tracey's income for the preceding month out of his account, but only if the account exceeds $10.00. Custodian shall continue such monthly payments until $350.00 filing fee is paid; 5) Petitioner must advise the Clerk of any change to his mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. 6) Matter stands submitted for initial screening.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/27/18.(MRS)cc: COR, Finance, Warden w/form EDKY 525 via US Mail, Pro Se filer via US Mail
November 27, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam W. Tracey (KJA)
November 27, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
November 27, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Adam W. Tracey, pro se. Mailing envelope attached at DE #1. (KJA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam W. Tracey, pro se. Mailing envelope attached at DE #1. Motions referred to P SO. (KJA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Adam W. Tracey, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 (2) mailing envelopes, front and back, postmarked 11/23/2018)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracey v. Wayne County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam W. Tracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Harvey Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Tim Catron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?