Clark v. John Does sued as "The Unknown Members of the Utilization Review Committee"

Plaintiff: Leonard Clark
Defendant: R. Jones, Ian Connors, Dankqua Vibete, B. Barron, Utilization Review Committee, Jennifer West, Ray Ormond, Federal Bureau of Prisons, J.F. Caraway and John Does
Case Number: 6:2019cv00011
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Clark's motion for an extension of time [R. #8 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 02/08/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, mailed paper copy to pro se filer
February 7, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Leonard Clark, pro se. (KJA)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Leonard Clark, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (KJA)
January 28, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Leonard Clark (MRS)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time of at least 60 days to pay $59.97 as directed by Order at DE #5 by Leonard Clark, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope front and back postmarked 1-24-19)(MRS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Partial Filing fee received - $ 5, receipt number 6007403. Docketed for administrative purposes only (Order DE #5 ) (SYD)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER #1 Complaint (Referred), filed by Leonard Clark: 1. Clark's construed motion to proceed in forma pauperis [R. 1-4] is GRANTED. 2. Because Clark has been granted pauper status in this proceeding, the $50.00administrative fee is waived. District Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, require a prisoner to pay the $350.00 filing fee as set forth below. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Clarks name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) and shall send the Notice and a copy of this Order to the warden of the institution in which Clark is confined. 4. The Clerk shall receipt the $5.00 already received from Clark and apply that sumtoward the $350.00 filing fee owed.5. Within twenty-eight (28) days, Clarks custodian shall deduct $59.97 from Clarks inmate account and remit that sum to the Clerk of the Court as an initial partial filing fee. 6. For each month thereafter, if the amount in Clarks inmate account exceeds $10.00, his custodian shall deduct from Clarks inmate account an amount equal to 20%. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/17/19. (Attachments: #1 525)(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer and warden with form; Finance
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 sample caption)(SYD)
January 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PRO SE for review: #3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #1 Complaint (Referred), (SYD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Leonard Clark, PRO SE. (SYD)
January 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT no summons(es) presented referred to PRO SE, filed by Leonard Clark., PRO SE (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Facts, #2 Cover letter, #3 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 1/10/19, #4 "typed Complaint", #5 Complaint on Form (updated 12/16), #6 Exhibits)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. John Does sued as "The Unknown Members of the Utilization Review Committee"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dankqua Vibete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utilization Review Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Ormond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.F. Caraway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?