Bates v. FCA US, LLC

Plaintiff: Rick Jason Bates
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00016
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: Hanly A Ingram
1 Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #12 Order. The hearing judge has been changed from Judge Van Tatenhove to correctly show Magistrate Judge Ingram. No action required by counsel. cc: COR (SYD)
March 14, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 9/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. (SYD)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNREDACTED ORDER re #12 Order cc: service electronically to ECF COR. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE DIRECTED TO LOG-IN TO CM/ECF TO VIEW THE DOCUMENT.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 3/14/19.(SYD)cc: COR
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER : A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 9/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly Ingram. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. To join the teleconference, the parties are DIRECTED as detailed in the unredacted order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 3/14/19.(SYD)cc: COR . Correct hearing Judge on 3/14/2019 (SYD).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) The following ddlns shall be observed: a) Initial disclosures by 3/13/2019; b) Fact Discovery by 3/31/2020; 2) Parties to observe FRCivP 5(d) directives; 3) Discovery disputes resolved as stated; DISPOSITIVE MTNS: a) Join addl parties or amend pleadings by 7/1/2019. b) Dispositive motions, motions in limine, and/or Daubert motions by 5/4/2020. PRETRIAL: 1) Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT; 2) 7/8/2020 pt filings due as stated; 3) NLT 10 days prior to FPTC a) pt memo; b) copy of Agreed proposed Jury Instructions. c) Agreed Statement of the Case; d) Proposed voir dire e) Motions for ruling by the Court upon any obj made in evid depo; 4. By 7/22/2020, counsel shall file a) written objs; b) Objs and counter-designations to depo testimony; 5. At FPTC parties shall be prepared to a) premark and display exhs; b) advise Court exhs have been displayed to opposing counsel; c) discuss stipulations; d) demo ability to use Court's visual presentation system; e) discuss settlement; 6) Court copies of a) witness list; b) exh list; c) proposed instructions; d) proposed voir dire questions and e) statement of the case, to be provided to Chambers, via email; JURY TRIAL set for 8/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Gregory F. Van Tatenhove. JT expected to last 4 days. EXTENSIONS OF TIME shall be submitted upon mtn prior to expiration of ddln; REFERRAL TO MJ: Matter referred to MJ Hanly A. Ingram to 1) supervise discovery and pt proceedings; 2. conduct all pt and status conferences, establishing and extending discovery ddlns and all other ddlns and holdings such hrgs as may be required, and ruling on non-dispositive mtns, except mtns in limine. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 03/13/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, Frankfort Diary, Frankfort Jury Clerk
March 5, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #10 JOINT Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (RBB)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Robinson, D.)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) NLT 30 days from the DOE of this Order, parties shall meet; 2) At the time of the meeting, cnsl exchange disclosures; 3) NLT 10 days after the meeting, cnsl shall FILE a joint written report and shall include information as listed w/in this order; 4) If this matter involves a corporation, the parties are directed to advise the Court. Rule 26 Meeting Report due as stated within this Order. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 02/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US, LLC. (Robinson, D.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, D. Christopher Robinson. #6 Answer to Complaint has been filed by FCA US, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RBB)
February 12, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Samuel W. Wardle for FCA US, LLC added. (RBB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FCA US, LLC.(Robinson, D.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rick Jason Bates via Certified Mail to FCA US, LLC served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Shoulders, Jessica)
January 17, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FCA US, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCOMPLETE document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; Docket clerk failed to attach the Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons to docket entry. Correct documents attached to this entry. re #1 Complaint ; Correct document attached to this entry. cc: COR (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to FCA US, LLC)(KJA)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4263039), filed by Rick Jason Bates.(KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to FCA US, LLC) (KJA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Jason Bates
Represented By: Kurt W. Maier
Represented By: Jessica Renee Shoulders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Samuel W. Wardle
Represented By: D. Christopher Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?