Butler v. Warden, USP McCreary
Plaintiff: Mikle Anthony Butler
Defendant: Warden, USP McCreary
Case Number: 6:2019cv00022
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Mikle Anthony Butler, pro se, styled as a motion, requesting a Bivens Packet. ***Note Clerk mailed EDKy 520 to filer on this date. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 3/06/2019) (KJA)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : Because Butler seeks no proper relief from the Court, as an administrative matter, the Court DISMISSES DE #1 WITHOUT PREJUDICE and STRIKES this matter from the active docket. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 1/31/19.(SYD)cc: mailed to pro se filer
January 29, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA)
January 29, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Mikle Anthony Butler, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 01/22/2019)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Warden, USP McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, USP McCreary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikle Anthony Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?