Rudder v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Henry Rudder
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2019cv00052
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Bryant, Rebecca)
March 27, 2019 Party Advance Stores Company, Incorporated terminated. (SYD)
March 27, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed by Henry Rudder. **Docketed Per Order at DE #18 **(SYD)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER : 1) The Plaintiffs motion to amend his complaint (DE #16 ) is GRANTED, there being no objection to the motion; 2) The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file the tendered amended complaint (DE #16 -2) into the record; 3) The defendants motion for an extension of time to respond to the amended complaint (DE #17 ) is GRANTED. On or before April 15, 2019, defendant MUST FILE an answer to the amended complaint or a motion under Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 12. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/27/19.(SYD)cc: COR
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bryant, Rebecca)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Henry Rudder (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kimberly A. Jones terminated. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/14/19. (SYD)cc: COR
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Kimberly)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: granting #12 Rebecca K. Bryant of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of Defendant, Aetna Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/6/19. (SYD)cc: COR, mailed to Rebecca with ECF reg and GO
March 5, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #12 MOTION for Rebecca K. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301222) (SYD)
March 5, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Rebecca K. Bryant re #12 MOTION for Rebecca K. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301222). (SYD)
March 5, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Rebecca K. Bryant for Aetna Life Insurance Company added. (SYD)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Rebecca K. Bryant to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4301222) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rebecca K. Bryant, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Rebecca K. Bryant, #3 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Kevin)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION for admission PHV: This cause has come before the Court upon the motion seeking an order granting Kimberly A. Jones of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. leave to appear pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing as counsel on behalf of Defendant, Aetna Life Insurance Company, in the above-styled cause only. Being fully advised, it is now ORDERED that the motion be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/21/19. (MRS)cc: COR,
February 21, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #10 MOTION for Kimberly Ann Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4291174) (SYD)
February 21, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Kimberly A. Jones re #10 MOTION for Kimberly Ann Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4291174). (SYD)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Kimberly Ann Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aetna Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4291174) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly A. Jones, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Kimberly A. Jones, #3 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Kevin)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer : Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including March 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/19/19.(SYD)cc: COR
February 19, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life Insurance Company (SYD)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter. The Court hereby DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign the case by random draw to another Judge accepting cases on the London docket pursuant to the General Order governing case assignment. ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Claria Horn Boom recused. Case reassigned to Judge Karen K. Caldwell for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 2/19/19.(SYD)cc: COR
February 19, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria H. Boom for review: re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life Insurance Company (SYD)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Kevin)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company. (INCORRECTLY filed in the fictitious action 5:19-mc-99999) (SYD)
February 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kevin Roberts. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SYD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Edward Roberts on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (SYD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Laurel Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-64, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4287838) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Removal (state court), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudder v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Edward Roberts
Represented By: Rebecca K. Bryant
Represented By: Kimberly A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Rudder
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Thornsbury
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?