Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC, Judson Weaver and Phoenix MMXV, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00068
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #15 Stipulation OF SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC, and Judson Weaver (KJA)
May 1, 2019 Party Phoenix MMXV, LLC added. Party Judson Weaver and Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC terminated pursuant to stipulated substitution of party defendant filed at DE #15 . (KJA)
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DEFENDANT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC, and Judson Weaver (Lenox, Bryce) Modified filers on 5/2/2019 (KJA).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 UNREDACTED ORDER re #13 Order, Set Hearings, cc: service electronically to ECF COR. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE DIRECTED TO LOG-IN TO CM/ECF TO VIEW THE DOCUMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/25/2019.(KJA)cc: COR
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCESHALL occur on 6/24/2019 at 11:30 AM. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. To join the teleconference, parties are DIRECTED to follow dial in instructions on unredacted Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to make the unredacted Order accessible to counsel of record electronically, and docket ONLY the redacted Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 04/25/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, London Diary
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) the following ddlns shall be observed: a) Initial disclosures by 5/7/19. These need not be filed in the Court record; b) Discovery as stated. i. Fact Discovery by 8/12/19; ii. Expert discovery nlt 11/20/19; c. Supplementation per Rule 26(e). Supplemental disclosures & responses need not be filed in the Court record; d. Motions to join addl parties or amend pleadings by 7/15/19; e. Identity of expert witnesses & written reports: i. from Plas 9/16/19; & ii. Dft 10/19/19; These need not be filed in the Court record f. Dispositive motions 10/21/19, w/response & reply time per Rule; g. W/in 30 days of making initial disclosures, identify the custodial & third-party sources of ESI. 2. Parties to observe FRCivP 5(d) directives; 3. FPTC before the undersigned on 2/25/20 at 10 a.m. at London. 4. NLT 21 days prior to ptc, counsel file the following: a. wit & exh list; b. motions in limine; c. evid depos to be used at trial; d. pt memo; e. proposed agreed jury instructions; 5. NLT 14 days before ptc: a. written objs; b. responses to motion in limine; c. responses to motion for ruling on obj. 6. At ptc, counsel be prepared to: a. make possible stipulations of admissibility; b. disclose demo or summary exhs; c. display all exhs to be used at trial; d. discuss possibility of settlement; e. advise Court of anticipated tech issues; 7. NLT 7 working days prior to trial counsel submit to Chambers a copy of each doc exh. 8. TRIAL BY JURY on 3/24/20 at 9:30 a.m. at London. Counsel present by 9:00 a.m. Anticipated length 3 days. 9. Referred to MJ Hanly A. Ingram to: a. resolve all non-dispositive motions; b. manage discovery; c. manage pt sched issues; d. 2. Conduct mid-discovery telephonic conference; e. conduct settlement conference. 10. Discovery disputes as stated. 11. Modification of this schedule is unlikely & will occur only for good cause. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 04/24/2019.(KJA)cc: COR, London Diary, Jury Clerk
April 17, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (RBB)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lenox, Bryce)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. The parties shall meet within twenty-one (21) days; 2. Within fourteen (14) days after the Rule 26(f) conference of the parties, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report; 3. Parties required to file FRCP 7.1 Disclosure statement if they have not already done so, at the time of the parties' joint status report. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(RBB)cc: COR
April 4, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #6 Answer to Complaint (RBB)
April 4, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Mason Moore Kessinger for Judson Weaver, Mason Moore Kessinger for Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC added. (RBB)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Lenox, Bryce)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. via Personal to Judson Weaver served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Lenox, Bryce)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC. (Kessinger, Benjamin)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Judson Weaver, Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC.(Kessinger, Benjamin)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (RBB)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (RBB)
March 6, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RBB)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Judson Weaver, Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel, Bryce A. Lenox, electronically (RBB)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4301997), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Weavers Hot Dogs LLC (Proposed), #3 Summons Judson Weaver (Proposed))(RBB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver's Hot Dogs LLC
Represented By: Benjamin L. Kessinger, III
Represented By: Mason Moore Kessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson Weaver
Represented By: Benjamin L. Kessinger, III
Represented By: Mason Moore Kessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix MMXV, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin L. Kessinger, III
Represented By: Mason Moore Kessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Bryce A. Lenox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?