Davis v. American Highwall Mining, LLC

Plaintiff: Bart Davis
Defendant: American Highwall Mining, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00096
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by American Highwall Mining, LLC (KJA)
June 13, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #1 Complaint (KJA)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to #7 , #5 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by American Highwall Mining, LLC. (Spurlock, Drayer)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by American Highwall Mining, LLC filed by Bart Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Hixson, Marshall)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Highwall Mining, LLC. - states that it has no parent corporation, and that no publicly held corporation holds any of its stock or ownership interests. (Spurlock, Drayer) Modified to add text on 5/9/2019 (MJY).
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by American Highwall Mining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing for Lack of Jurisdiction)(Spurlock, Drayer)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bart Davis via certified mail to American Highwall Mining, LLC served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (Hixson, Marshall)
April 16, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Highwall Mining, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4336149), filed by Bart Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #2 Summons For American Highwall Mining, LLC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. American Highwall Mining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Davis
Represented By: Walter Blaine Early, III
Represented By: Marshall R. Hixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Highwall Mining, LLC
Represented By: Howard O. Mann
Represented By: Drayer B. Spurlock
Represented By: Gary W. Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?