Clark v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Clark
Defendant: Teresa Johnson and Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00114
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sharon Clark AND OBJECTION TO REMOVAL filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kevin Stafford)(Mays, Laura)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court GRANTS DE #7 and ENLARGES Defendant's response time to June 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/4/19.(MRS)cc: COR
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mays, Laura)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Schaeffer, Brittney re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sharon Clark : Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit A, Exhibit B. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc cc: COR (SYD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Sharon Clark (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Discovery Request, #3 Exhibit 2-Mitchell v Dow, #4 Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Brittney) Named Exhibit on 5/14/2019 (SYD).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26, the Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. 2. Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 05/08/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Mays, Laura)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Laura L. Mays. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SYD)
May 3, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
May 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Teresa Johnson. Attached to the NOR as part of the State Court Record, DE #1 (SYD)
May 3, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowe's Companies, Inc. Attached to the NOR as part of the State Court Record, DE #1 (SYD)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Perry Circuit Court, case number No. 19-CI-124, filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4351373) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-1 Summons, #3 Exhibit B-2 Lowe's Answer, #4 Exhibit B-3 Johnson's Answer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Johnson
Represented By: Laura Leigh Mays
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Kissel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Leigh Mays
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Kissel
Represented By: Gene Smallwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Clark
Represented By: Brittney N. Schaeffer
Represented By: William R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?