Goins v. Adecco USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Emma Goins
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00133
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Emma Goins filed by Adecco USA, Inc.. (Schneider, Craig)
July 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re MOTION for Default Judgment by Emma Goins (SYD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Emma Goins (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Remanding to Perry Circuit Court)(Roberts, William)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO William Jacob Roberts: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #5 Order,. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, William Jacob Roberts by US Mail with ECF Registration Form (KJA)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Parties SHALL REFILE any pending motions in the record separately and in compliance with the Joint Local Rules for the Eastern District of Kentucky within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Adecco USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 06/14/2019.(KJA)cc: COR copy of Order to William Jacob Roberts via US Mail
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adecco USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ADO Staffing, Inc. for Adecco USA, Inc... (Schneider, Craig)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Craig Schneider. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Adecco USA, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SYD)
May 31, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Attached to the NOR as part of the State Court Record (SYD)
May 30, 2019 RESPONSE in Opposition re MOTION for Default Judgment by Emma Goins filed by Adecco USA, Inc.. Attached to the NOR as part of the State Court Record (SYD)
May 30, 2019 MOTION for Default Judgment by Emma Goins.. Attached to the NOR as part of the State Court Record (SYD)
May 30, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Adecco USA, Inc. Attached to the NOR as part of the State Court Record (SYD)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Perry Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-449, filed by Adecco USA, Inc.( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4373424) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. Adecco USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc.
Represented By: Craig M. Schneider
Represented By: Judd R. Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Goins
Represented By: William Jacob Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?