Nichols v. Fireborn Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Cara Nichols and Cynthia Morris
Defendant: Fireborn Energy, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00154
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The following deadlines shall be observed: (a) Parties shall exchange info required by Rule 26(a)(1) by 08/26/2019. These do not need to be filed in the record; (b) Motions to join parties/amend pleadings by 11/25/2019; (c) Supplementation of disclosures and responses as required by Rule 26(e). Supplemental disclosures and responses need not be filed in the Court record; (d) Rule 26(a)(2) reports from expert trial witnesses due: (i) Pla by 01/27/2020; (ii) Dft by 02/24/2020; (e)Fact discovery completed by 1/20/2020; No later than 03/30/2020, parties shall complete expert discovery; and (f) Dispositive mtns by 04/13/2020, with response and reply time per Local Rule. 2. Should the parties agree to mediate, the deadline to do so is 05/28/2020. 3. No motions to compel, nor any other motions relating to a discovery dispute, shall be filed unless all counsel involved in such dispute have first conferred 4. The parties shall observe the following directives regarding the filing of discovery materials: (a) Discovery not filed; (b) Discovery depos cited in mtn or used at trial shall be filed. 5. No extensions of ddlns granted unless appropriate mtn filed. 6. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 8/5/2020 at 01:00 PM 7. JURY TRIAL set for 9/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in LONDON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell(est 3 days). This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for managing discovery, conducting settlement conference. Discovery disputes resolved as set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 08/19/2019.(MM)cc: COR, London Diary, Jury Clerk Modified text on 8/20/2019 (MM).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER: 1. No later than twenty-one (21) days before the Pretrial Conference, counsel shall file the following: a. file witness & exhibit lists; b. any appropriate motions in limine; c. the transcript of all evidentiary depositions; d. a pretrial memorandum brief; e. proposed agreed jury instructions.; f. proposed voir dire questions; 2. No later than fourteen (14) days before the Pretrial Conference, the parties shall file: a. written objections to witnesses and exhibits; b. responses to any other partys motion in limine; and c. responses to any other partys motion for a ruling on any objection made in an evidentiary deposition.; 3. At the Pretrial Conference, counsel for the parties shall be prepared to: a. discuss and make possible stipulations of admissibility,; b. disclose any demonstrative or summary exhibits intended for use at trial; c. display all exhibits, pre-marked; d. discuss the possibility of settlement; and e. advise of technological issues; 4. Final PTC attended by attorneys trying case w/ parties and/or representatives. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 08/19/2019.(MM)cc: COR
August 9, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (SYD)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Charest, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim filed by Defendant by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols.(Charest, Daniel) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (SYD).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) W/I 21 days parties shall conduct the meeting of parties. 2) W/I 10 days after meeting, parties shall file joint status report. In the event this matter involves a corporation or partnership, the party is directed to advise the Court at the time of the submission of the parties joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/22/19.(SYD)cc: COR
July 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint (SYD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fireborn Energy, LLC. (Saunders, Darrell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Fireborn Energy, LLC.(Saunders, Darrell)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court being sufficiently advised, it is hereby ORDERED that these Motions are GRANTED. Accordingly, Messrs. Charest and Buller shall be admitted pro hac vice into this Court in the above-styled action. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 07/17/2019.(KJA)cc: COR - Order and ECF Registration Form to Daniel H. Charest and Morgan M. Buller via US Mail
July 17, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #4 MOTION for Daniel H. Charest to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4413825), #5 MOTION for Morgan M. Buller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4413842) (MRS)
July 17, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Morgan M. Buller re #5 MOTION for Morgan M. Buller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4413842). (MRS)
July 17, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Daniel H. Charest re #4 MOTION for Daniel H. Charest to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4413825). (MRS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Morgan M. Buller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4413842) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Buller and Bar Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)(Ransdell, W.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Daniel H. Charest to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4413825) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Charest and Bar Certificate, #2 Proposed Order)(Ransdell, W.)
June 25, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fireborn Energy, LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4395360), filed by Cynthia Morris, Cara Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Fireborn Energy, LLC)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Fireborn Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Nichols
Represented By: David T. Royse
Represented By: W. Keith Ransdell
Represented By: Daniel H. Charest
Represented By: Morgan M. Buller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Morris
Represented By: David T. Royse
Represented By: W. Keith Ransdell
Represented By: Daniel H. Charest
Represented By: Morgan M. Buller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireborn Energy, LLC
Represented By: Darrell L. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?