Swinehart v. Shannon et al
Plaintiff: Brian Joseph Swinehart
Defendant: Ed Marshall and Janice Shannon
Case Number: 6:2019cv00179
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re #4 MOTION for Michael Benjamin Ely to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Joseph Swinehart (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4451038) (RBB)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Joseph Venters re #4 MOTION for Michael Benjamin Ely to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Joseph Swinehart: Error: Exhibit was filed together with the motion instead of asseparate attachment. Entry by attorney; Clerk added the exhibit as separateattachments. In the future, file each exhibit separately from one another andseparate from the main document. No further action required by counsel. cc:COR (RBB)
August 29, 2019 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Michael Benjamin Ely re #4 MOTION for Michael Benjamin Ely to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Joseph Swinehart. (Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4451038). (RBB)
August 28, 2019 Attorney Update. Attorney Michael Benjamin Ely for Brian Joseph Swinehart added. (RBB)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael Benjamin Ely to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Joseph Swinehart ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4451038) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Venters, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2019: #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas) (RBB).
August 26, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: #2 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal (SYD)
July 26, 2019 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ed Marshall, Janice Shannon.(SYD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wayne Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-192, filed by Janice Shannon, Ed Marshall. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4421898) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record -Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swinehart v. Shannon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Marshall
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Shannon
Represented By: Timothy L. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Joseph Swinehart
Represented By: Joseph B. Venters
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Ely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?