Harrell v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roberta H. Harrell
Defendant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00185
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Partin, William)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING by Roberta H. Harrell discovery requests (Williams, Jason)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 08/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. OF SERVICE (Partin, William)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(Partin, William)
July 30, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (MM)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4424474), filed by Roberta H. Harrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Partin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta H. Harrell
Represented By: Jason E. Williams
Represented By: William A. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?