Curry v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Micheal Curry
Defendant: B.J. Burkhart, Mitch Miller and Dillon Brock
Case Number: 6:2019cv00197
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Micheal Curry: It is ORDERED as follows: 1. Curry's complaint [R. 1] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. The Clerk shall send Curry a Court-approved complaint form [E.D. Ky. 520 Form]. 4. The Clerk shall also send Curry an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [AO 240 Form] and a Certificate of Inmate Account Form [E.D. Ky. 523 Form]. 5. Ultimately, if Curry wishes to pursue his claims, he may do so by completing and filing the forms in accordance with the instructions set forth above. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 08/16/2019.(MM)cc: COR, pro se filer via US Mail (along with EDKY 520, AO 240 and EDKY 523 forms)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00085. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Pro Se filer
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/13/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Southern Division at London, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; USDC - KYED (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 8/13/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Michael Curry. (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 8/13/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Curry, pro se. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/13/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Curry, pro se. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/13/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/13/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dillon Brock, B.J. Burkhart, Mitch Miller, filed by Michael Curry, pro se. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 8/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.J. Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?