Six Hogs, LLC v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Six Hogs, LLC
Defendant: John Doe and Samsonico USA LLC
Case Number: 6:2020cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Samsonico USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Letter to Plaintiff, #4 Proposed Order)(Francis, James)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint : The new deadline to Answer or Respond to the Complaint is February 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/12/20.(SYD)cc: COR
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Francis, James)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC. (Francis, James)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Six Hogs, LLC via personal service to John Doe served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Montague, William)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Six Hogs, LLC via personal service on registered agent to Samsonico USA LLC served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. (Montague, William)
January 4, 2020 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Six Hogs, LLC. (Montague, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form e-mailed to Register. (MM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, William L. Montague, Jr.. #1 Complaint has been filed by Six Hogs, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (MM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Doe, Samsonico USA LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Samsonico USA LLC)(MM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4558984), filed by Six Hogs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons John Doe dba Samsonico International Inc., #3 Summons Samsonico USA LLC)(MM)
January 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Six Hogs, LLC v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsonico USA LLC
Represented By: James M. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Six Hogs, LLC
Represented By: William L. Montague, Jr.
Represented By: George David McClure, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?