H.W. v. Pulaski County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: H.W.
Defendant: Britani Shoemaker, Pulaski County Board of Education, Alex Eaton, Patrick Richardson and Danita Ellis
Case Number: 6:2020cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: David L Bunning
2 Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Parties meet within 21 days; 2) Within 14 days after the meeting, cnsl shall FILE a written report outlining the proposed discovery plan the report shall include information as defined within (a-o); 3) Any party required to file a disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 that has not already done so, shall file same at the time of the parties' joint status report. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 03/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(MM)cc: COR
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tommie Weatherly on April 13, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. by Alex Eaton, Alex Eaton, Danita Ellis, Danita Ellis, Pulaski County Board of Education, Patrick Richardson, Patrick Richardson, Britani Shoemaker, Britani Shoemaker.(Bryson, Larry)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Heidi Weatherly on April 13, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by Alex Eaton, Alex Eaton, Danita Ellis, Danita Ellis, Pulaski County Board of Education, Patrick Richardson, Patrick Richardson, Britani Shoemaker, Britani Shoemaker.(Bryson, Larry)
March 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to Take Deposition of H.W. on April 13, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. by Alex Eaton, Alex Eaton, Danita Ellis, Danita Ellis, Pulaski County Board of Education, Patrick Richardson, Patrick Richardson, Britani Shoemaker, Britani Shoemaker.(Bryson, Larry)
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Alex Eaton, Alex Eaton, Danita Ellis, Danita Ellis, Pulaski County Board of Education, Patrick Richardson, Patrick Richardson, Britani Shoemaker, Britani Shoemaker Notice of Service of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Bryson, Larry)
March 3, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint (KJA)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.W. via personal service to Pulaski County Board of Education served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020; Patrick Richardson served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020; Patrick Richardson served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (MM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H.W. via personal service to Alex Eaton served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; Alex Eaton served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; Danita Ellis served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; Danita Ellis served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; Britani Shoemaker served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; Britani Shoemaker served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (MM)
February 6, 2020 Clerk's Note: Case is NOT REFERRED to Pro Se; therefore, Pro Se referral has been removed.(RBB)
February 5, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom and P SO. Judge David L. Bunning no longer assigned to the case. (RBB)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alex Eaton, Alex Eaton, Danita Ellis, Danita Ellis, Pulaski County Board of Education, Patrick Richardson, Patrick Richardson, Britani Shoemaker, Britani Shoemaker.(Bryson, Larry)
January 15, 2020 Case REASSIGNED to Judge David L. Bunning. Judge Claria Horn Boom no longer assigned to the case due to clerical error. Plaintiff is proceeding pro se. (SKV)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/16.(SYD)cc: H.W. by US Mail
January 15, 2020 Conflict Check run. (SYD)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alex Eaton, Alex Eaton, Danita Ellis, Danita Ellis, Pulaski County Board of Education, Patrick Richardson, Patrick Richardson, Britani Shoemaker, Britani Shoemaker; Summons issued and returned to counsel via pick-up from Office of Clerk (SYD)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by H.W. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 6008017) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Ex 1-30 to the Exhibit), #2 Receipt, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.W. v. Pulaski County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britani Shoemaker
Represented By: Larry G. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Board of Education
Represented By: Larry G. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Eaton
Represented By: Larry G. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Richardson
Represented By: Larry G. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danita Ellis
Represented By: Larry G. Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.W.
Represented By: Heidi Weatherly
Represented By: Tommie L. Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?