Cottrell v. SSA
Plaintiff: Kathy May Cottrell
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 6:2020cv00056
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: 1. Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; 2. Secretary file response w/in 90 days; 3. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause. (KJA)cc: COR
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Transcript - Social Security)(Morgan, Cheryl)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathy May Cottrell via USMS via Certified Mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 3/17/2020. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via Certified Mail by USMS on 03/11/2020; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via Certified Mail by USMS on 3/16/2020. (KJA)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2020: #1 USM Receipt) (RBB).
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff' motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [R. #1 ] is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff may proceed without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 03/05/2020. (KJA)cc: COR
March 5, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kathy May Cottrell (MM)
March 5, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MM)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT, filed by Kathy May Cottrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM Form 285, #3 Summons as to SSA, #4 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General, #5 Summons as to U.S. Attorney EDKy)(MM)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kathy May Cottrell (MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottrell v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy May Cottrell
Represented By: Ronald C. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?