Johnson v. Cunnagin et al
Plaintiff: LaQuan Johnson
Defendant: Warden Gregory A. Kizziah, Dr. Nadum, Ms. Free, Jennifer Reed, Carrie Cunnagin and Ms. Jones
Case Number: 6:2020cv00143
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Carrie Cunnagin, Free, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (KJA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2020: #1 USM Receipt stamped 9/2/2020) (KJA).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Johnsons claims against Dr. Nadum, Ms. Jones, Gregory Kizziah, Jennifer Reed, John Doe, and Jane Doe are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. 2. Deputy Clerk prepare "service packets" for service upon the United States of America, the Office of the Attorney General, and Defendants Dr. Carrie Cunnagin and Nurse Free. Each Service Packet shall include: a-d. 3. Delivery packets to USMS. 4. USMS serve USA. 5. USMS personally serve Cunnagin and Free. 6. Johnson advise of change in address. Nadum (Doctor), Jennifer Reed (Case Manager), Jones (Overseer of the entire medical department) and Gregory A. Kizziah (Warden (former)) terminated. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/2/20.(SYD)cc: LaQuan Johnson by US Mail
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: denying #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court will screen Johnsons claims by subsequent order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/29/20. (SYD)cc: LaQuan Johnson by US Mail
July 20, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LaQuan Johnson (KJA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LaQuan Johnson, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 07/15/2020)(KJA)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. granting #2 Johnson's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. Within twenty-eight (28) days, Johnson must pay $11.18 to the Clerk of the Courtas an initial partial filing fee. 4. Clerk open an account for receipt of filing fee. Clerk complete Form EDKY 525. Serve copy of Order and Form upon the Warden. 4. Each month Johnson's custodian send Clerk a payment. 5. Johnson advise Clerk of change in address. 6. Matter stands for initial screening. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/9/20. (Attachments: #1 EDky 525) (SYD)cc: Finance; Warden and LaQuan Johnson by US Mail
July 6, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaQuan Johnson (MM)
July 6, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (MM)
July 6, 2020 Conflict Check run. (MM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by LaQuan Johnson, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmarked 6/30/2020)(MM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaQuan Johnson, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Postmarked 6/30/2020)(MM)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by LaQuan Johnson, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Various Attachments, #2 Envelope - Postmarked 6/30/2020)(MM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cunnagin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Gregory A. Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nadum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Free
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Cunnagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaQuan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?