Boggs et al v. Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jimmy Boggs and Kimberly Boggs
Defendant: Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc. doing business as Lifeguard Ambulance
Case Number: 6:2020cv00149
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1) Parties meet within 21 days; 2) Within 14 days after the meeting, cnsl shall FILE a written report outlining the proposed discovery plan the report shall include information as defined within (a-o); 3) Any party required to file a disclosure statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 that has not already done so, shall file same at the time of the parties' joint status report. Rule 26 Meeting Report due as stated within this order. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(MM)cc: COR
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jimmy Boggs, Kimberly Boggs. (Oswald, Clayton)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc. Filed pursuant to DE #5 Order.(MM)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer [R. #3 ] is GRANTED. 2. The tendered Answer filed at [R. #3 -1] shall be filed in the record as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/21/2020. (MM)cc: COR
July 20, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc. d/b/a Lifeguard Ambulance. (KJA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 - 2 State Court Complaint re filed as part of the Notice of Removal, by Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Tendered Answer to Complaint)(KJA)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harlan Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00187. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4726308), filed by Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boggs et al v. Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Ambulance of Evansville, Inc. doing business as Lifeguard Ambulance
Represented By: Christine Louise Stanley
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Boggs
Represented By: Otis Doan, Jr.
Represented By: Clayton O. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Boggs
Represented By: Otis Doan, Jr.
Represented By: Clayton O. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?