Bailey v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Benny Ray Bailey
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II and Joanne M. Chiedi
Case Number: 6:2020cv00166
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Clerk SHALL strike Mr. Bina as counsel of record. Attorney Mark W. Bina terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 9/28/20. (SYD)cc: COR
September 25, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Benny Ray Bailey (KJA)
September 24, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Benny Ray Bailey Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blank, David)
September 22, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: #25 Notice to Attorney Mark W. Bina. No action taken. (KJA) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (KJA).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion #27 for Mr. Blank to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 09/04/2020. (KJA)cc: COR - Order, Copy of Mandatory ECF General Order & ECF Registration to David M. Blank by US Mail
September 3, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: #30 Response in Support of Motion (KJA)
September 2, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE to the Court's Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion Seeking Leave of Court to Grant Pro Hac Vice re #27 MOTION for David Michael Blank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benny Ray Bailey filed by Benny Ray Bailey. (KJA)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #27 MOTION for David Michael Blank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benny Ray Bailey : Mr. Blank SHALL file, on or before Thursday,September 3, 2020, a supplement to the motion that identifies the method of training availablethrough the Eastern District of Kentucky Clerks office completed by him. Mr. Blank maycontact the Clerks office for further direction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 8/21/20.(SYD)cc: COR, mailed to David Blank
August 19, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: re #27 MOTION for David Michael Blank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benny Ray Bailey (KJA)
August 19, 2020 BAR STATUS Check completed as to David Michael Blank re #27 MOTION for David Michael Blank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benny Ray Bailey. (KJA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Blank on behalf of Benny Ray Bailey (KJA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for David Michael Blank to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benny Ray Bailey Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit The Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Receipt #5030561)(KJA)
August 7, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY David Michael Blank by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Form)(KJA)
August 7, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Mark W. Bina by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 Attorney Data Form)(KJA)
August 6, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex M. Azar, II. (Williams, Jennifer)
August 6, 2020 Clerk's Note: re #23 Scheduling Order mailed to counsel of record Mark W. Bina and David Michael Blank on this date. (KJA)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: To set the matter on track for resolution, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff must move for summary judgment or judgment on the pleadings within sixty (60) days. Plaintiff shall include a supporting memorandum that does not exceed 15 pages in length. 2. The Secretary and Acting Inspector General must file a counter-motion or a response to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment within thirty (30) days of the filing of the motion for summary judgment or judgment on the pleadings. The counter-motion or response shall not exceed 15 pages in length. 3. Motion practice shall be governed by Local Rule 7.1 except as otherwise provided in this order. 4. Extensions of time, expansions of page limitations, or permission to file additional briefs may be granted only if good cause is shown. 5. The parties are granted leave to seek relief from this procedure and/or deadlines by proper motion. Dispositive Motions due by 10/6/2020. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 8/6/2020.(RBB)cc: COR
August 4, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: #20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of District of Columbia. Case number 1:19-cv-01721. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (KJA)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (KJA)cc: COR Mark Bina, David Michael Blank. Modified to text on 8/4/2020 (KJA).
August 4, 2020 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of District of Columbia. Case number 1:19-cv-01721. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: COR w/ docket sheet
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. For the Reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss [Dkt. # 12] is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall TRANSFER this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. SO ORDERED. (Transfer due by 8/1/2020). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/21/2020. (jth) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/21/2020. (jth) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paul Cirino on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Scott Leeson Sroka (Cirino, Paul) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II, JOANNE M. CHIEDI. (Sroka, Scott) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants' #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, it hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that the time for Defendants to file their Reply is hereby extended up to and including October 24, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/14/2019. (lcrjl1) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by ALEX M. AZAR, II, JOANNE M. CHIEDI (Sroka, Scott) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BENNY RAY BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by ALEX M. AZAR, II, JOANNE M. CHIEDI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record Volume 1, #2 Exhibit Administrative Record Volume 2, #3 Exhibit Administrative Record Volume 3, #4 Exhibit Administrative Record Volume 4, #5 Exhibit Index)(Sroka, Scott) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by ALEX M. AZAR, II, JOANNE M. CHIEDI (Sroka, Scott) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that David M. Blank be, and hereby is, admitted pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/17/19. (lcrjl1) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David M. Blank, :Firm- Quarles & Brady LLP, :Address- 1701 Pennsylvania Ave, NW, Suite 700, Washington DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-780-2643. Fax No. - (202) 372-9599 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6340493. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BENNY RAY BAILEY (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Blank, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the time for Defendants to file their Answer is hereby extended up to and including September 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/26/2019. (lcrjl1) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II, JOANNE M. CHIEDI (Sroka, Scott) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Sroka, Scott) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/20/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mailing Affidavit - USAO, #2 Certificate of Service Delivery Confirmation - USAO / USPS)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mailing - AG Barr, #2 Certificate of Service Delivery Confirmation - Barr)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOANNE M. CHIEDI served on 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mailing Affidavit - Chiedi, #2 Certificate of Service Delivery Confirmation - Chiedi)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 6/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mailing Affidavit for Azar, #2 Certificate of Service USPS Delivery Confirmation of Certified Mail - Return Receipt)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
July 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/28/19. (lcrjl1) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX MICHAEL AZAR, II, JOANNE M. CHIEDI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA - Complaint by BENNY RAY BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Azar Summons, #4 Summons Chiedi Summons, #5 Summons USAO Summons, #6 Summons AG Summons)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to ALEX MICHAEL AZAR, II, JOANNE M. CHIEDI. (zef, ) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zef, ) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, JOANNE CHIEDI with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6185183) filed by BENNY RAY BAILEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Final Administrative Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to Secretary Azar, #4 Summons Summons to Acting IG Chiedi)(Bina, Mark) [Transferred from dcd on 8/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Ray Bailey
Represented By: Mark W. Bina
Represented By: David Michael Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Represented By: Jennifer A. Williams, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne M. Chiedi
Represented By: Scott Leeson Sroka
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?