Edwards v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Edwards
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 6:2020cv00173
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 CONVENTIONAL FILING received on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Administrative Claim Record is filed UNDER SEAL per re #8 Order on Motion for Leave. (MAINTAINED ON THE SHELF IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE) (SYD)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: granting #7 Motion. the Administrative Claim Record is hereby filed under seal, with access to be provided only to the Court, parties and counsel. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/22/20. (SYD)cc: COR
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave by Life Insurance Company of North America to file record under seal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wyrick, Mitzi)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #5 Order,,,, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Wyrick, Mitzi)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Court hereby ORDERS: (1) No later than thirty (30) days from the entry of this order, counsel for the parties shall confer and file a written joint report setting out the appropriate standards of review and shall file the record which was before the plan administrator. If the parties are unable to agree on the appropriate standards of review, no later than forty-five (45) days from the entry of this order, each shall file a brief not to exceed five (5) pages setting forth their position regarding the standard of review. (2) No later than sixty (60) days from the entry of this order, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment reversing the administrative decision. (3) No later than thirty (30) days following the filing of plaintiff's motion, counsel for the defendant shall file a Response thereto. (4) No later than fifteen (15) days following the filing of defendant's response, counsel for the plaintiff may file a Reply. (5) That upon filing of the above, the case shall stand submitted. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/24/2020.(RBB)cc: COR
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Wyrick, Mitzi)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent CIGNA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America. (KJA)
August 12, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harlan Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00188. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4746577), filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Edwards
Represented By: E. Douglas Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David A. Calhoun
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?