Miller v. Brummett et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Cecil Miller
Defendant: Officer Mike Brummett, Sheriff Franklin and Officer Kirk Mays
Case Number: 6:2020cv00176
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Pursuant to the doctrine of Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971), the Court ABSTAINS from further evaluating or adjudicating Miller's complaint at this time. 2. This matter is STAYED for the pendency of Millers state court criminal proceedings; and 3. Every ninety (90) days (beginning 90 days from the date of this Order), Miller must file a "Status Report" with the Court in this case, explaining the status of his state criminal cases and whether or not those cases remain pending or have been resolved, and if they have been resolved, how. Failure to provide the Court with these status reports may result in Miller's civil rights claims being dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 09/08/2020.(KJA)cc: COR and Timothy Cecil Miller by US Mail
August 18, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1. granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. payment of such fee is therefore DEFERRED. 3. Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Millers name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525)with (a) Millers name, (b) his inmate registration number, and (c) this case number.The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form uponthe Jailer/Warden of the institution in which Miller is currently confined and uponthe Office of the General Counsel for the Department of Corrections in Frankfort,Kentucky. 4. Each month Millers custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in anamount equal to 20% of his income for the preceding month. 5. Miller must immediately advise the Clerks Office of any change in his currentmailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case.6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/18/20. (Attachments: #1 EDky 525) (SYD)cc: Jailer; Office of General Counseland Timothy Cecil Miller by US Mail
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KJA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy Cecil Miller, pro se. Note: Mailing envelope attached at DE #1 . (KJA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Cecil Miller, pro se. Note: Mailing envelope attached at DE #1 . Motions referred to P SO. (KJA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Timothy Cecil Miller, pro se. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 08/11/2020)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Brummett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Mike Brummett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kirk Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Cecil Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?