Hart v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Hart and Ashley A. Blalock
Defendant: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 6:2020cv00184
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Withdraw [R. #14 ] is GRANTED. Melissa R. Dixon is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the Plaintiff, Ashley Hart. R. Scott Wilder shall continue as counsel for the Plaintiff, Ashley Hart. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/02/2020. (MM)cc: COR
November 2, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: re #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ashley Hart (MM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ashley Hart (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dixon, Melissa)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Amend by Ashley Hart ComplaintMOTION for to Join New Party and Objection filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Banks, Darrin)
September 25, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (MM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Maines, Susan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Amend by Ashley Hart ComplaintMOTION for to Join New Party filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Overruling Motion to Amend)(Maines, Susan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING by Ashley Hart re #8 MOTION to Amend by Ashley Hart ComplaintMOTION for to Join New Party (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dixon, Melissa)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Melissa Dixon re #8 MOTION to Amend by Ashley Hart Complaint and MOTION to Join New Party; attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days, prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing", file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (RBB)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company filed by Ashley Hart. (Dixon, Melissa)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend by Ashley Hart Complaint, and MOTION to Join New Party by Ashley Hart (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint)(Dixon, Melissa) Modified on 9/18/2020 (RBB).
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maines, Susan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Maines, Susan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa R. Dixon on behalf of Ashley Hart (Dixon, Melissa)
September 4, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Filed as part of the NOR at #1 -1(KJA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (KJA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00312. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4768197), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 State Court Record - Complaint, #3 Letter of Consent of Removal on behalf of Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Hart
Represented By: John M. Gambrel
Represented By: Ronald Scott Wilder
Represented By: Melissa R. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley A. Blalock
Represented By: John M. Gambrel
Represented By: Ronald Scott Wilder
Represented By: Melissa R. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Lynn Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Darrin Winn Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?