Barcus v. Bates et al
Plaintiff: Trevon Barcus
Defendant: Anthony McCollum, Robert Bates and Pulaski County Detention Center
Case Number: 6:2021cv00100
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 15 Letter from Trevon Barcus, pro se, requesting financial affidavit and prisoner account statement forms. CLERK'S NOTE: Requested forms previously mailed to Mr. Barcus per Order at DE #13 . (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 08/17/2021) (APR)
August 11, 2021 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 21-5758 Case Manager Michelle Lambert for #12 Notice of Appeal, filed by Trevon Barcus. (SYD)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Notice of Appeal: 1. Clerk send Barcus forms; 2. W/I 30 days Barcus pay fee or file forms. 3. Clerk forward order to USCA. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/11/21.(SYD)cc: 6th Cir. and Trevon Barcus w/forms by US Mail
August 10, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of pro se for review: #12 Notice of Appeal, (SYD)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order, #8 Judgment, by Trevon Barcus, pro se. (SHORT RECORD MAILED). NO FILING FEE PAID. cc: 6CCA. NOTE: Documents from received from 6CCA on 8/10/21 and filed pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.4(d) on July 30, 2021 (filing date same as 6CCA). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 mailing envelope addressed to 6th Circuit (postmark not legible), #3 Cover letter from 6th Circuit, to USDC)(SYD)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: 1.Barcus's motion to amend the complaint [R. #9 ] and motion to correct the summons [R. #10 ] are DENIED AS MOOT; and 2. This matter remains CLOSED and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/14/2021. (MM)cc: COR
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to correct summons error by Trevon Barcus, pro seMotions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons with USM 285 form) (Note: Mailing Envelope located at DE #9 ).(MRS)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Trevon Barcus, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope postmarked 7.8.21)(MRS)
July 12, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Trevon Barcus, #10 MOTION for Order by Trevon Barcus (MRS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: 1.Plaintiff Trevon Barcuss civil rights complaint [R. 1] is DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted;2.Judgment is ENTERED in favor of the Defendants;3.This action is CLOSED and STRICKEN from the Courts docket; and4.This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no justcause for delay. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/2/21.(SYD)cc: Trevon Barcus by US Mail
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Complaint:1.Barcuss complaint [R. 1] is DISMISSED for failure to state a viableclaim. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), 1915A;2.Judgment will be entered contemporaneously herewith; and3.This matter is CLOSED and STRICKEN from the Courts docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/2/21.(SYD)cc: Trevon Barcus by US Mail
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. Barcus's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED. Section 1915(b)(1) requires an inmate to pay the $350.00 filing fee for a civil action as set forth below. 2. Because of the lack of available assets in Barcus's account at this time, an initial partial filing for this matter is WAIVED. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Barcus's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form (Form EDKY 525) containing: (1) Barcus's name, (2) his inmate registration, and (3) this case number. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form upon the warden of the institution in which Barcus is currently confined. 4. Each month Barcus's custodian shall send the Clerk of the Court a payment in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of Barcus's income for the preceding month out of his inmate account, but only if the amount exceeds $10.00. The custodian shall continue such monthly payments until the entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. 5. Barcus must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change to his current mailing address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. 6. This matter stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(e)(2), 1915A. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 06/28/2021. (APR)cc: COR, Finance, Trevon Barcus by US Mail, and copy to Pulaski County Detention Center with EDKY 525
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Trevon Barcus. (JLC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trevon Barcus Motions referred to P SO. (JLC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Trevon Barcus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons USM 285 Non Issued- Robert Bates, #3 Summons USM 285 Non Issued- Anthony McCollum, #4 Summons USM 285 Non Issued- Pulaski Co. Detention Center, #5 Exhibit Envelope PM Illegible)(JLC)
June 21, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr. for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trevon Barcus (JLC)
June 21, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barcus v. Bates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevon Barcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?