Patel et al v. Gram Resources, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashokkumar R. Patel,, M.D and Mahender Pampati, M.D.
Defendant: Gram Resources, Inc., Hazard Radiology Associates, Inc., Anand Lalaji, M.D., The Radiology Group, LLC, William Crenshaw and TRG Holdings G & H, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00141
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Donald Miller re #18 Notice - Error: attachment insufficiently described as "Exhibit"; Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk modified exhibit text; no further action needed from counsel cc: COR (APR)
September 24, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by TRG Holdings G & H, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Receipt)(Miller, Donald). Modified attachment description on 9/28/2021 (APR).
September 2, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: #17 REPLY BRIEF, to #16 , #7 Redacted Reply brief filed by Mahender Pampati, MD (KJA)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to #16 , #7 Redacted Reply brief filed by Mahender Pampati, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MMIC contract redacted, #2 Exhibit MCHC contract redacted, #3 Exhibit bank records redacted, #4 Exhibit address change)(Morgan, Daniel)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: 1) DE 6 motion to remand is GRANTED; 2) Plas' motion for atty fees is GRANTED. Removing dfts (those on DE 1) shall jointly and severally pay plas the amt of $6,000.00 within 30 days; 3) DE 5 and DE 15 motions are DENIED federally and reserved to the state Court; 4) DE 8 is DENIED federally and reserved to the state court; and 5) DE 12 motion to file DE 13 reply under seal is GRANTED on the terms stated above. Plas shall file a redacted version within 5 days of the filing of this order. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 8/25/21. (MRS)cc: COR, Certified Copy mailed to Perry Circuit Court Clerk
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 SECOND MOTION written restraining order re #5 MOTION by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD to Enter Written Restraining Order by Mahender Pampati, MD Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email announcing end of contract, #2 Exhibit email requesting insurance policy, #3 Exhibit email with ins analysis, #4 Proposed Order issuing restraining order, #5 Proposed Order setting show cause hearing)(Morgan, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (KJA)cc: COR
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed pursuant to MOTION TO SEAL re #9 Objections, #6 MOTION to Remand by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Physician Management and Practice Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Agreeent, #3 Exhibit C - Bank Statement (Redacated), #4 Exhibit D - SOS Change of Address) (Maclin, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maclin, Robert) Modified to remove referral language on 8/23/2021 (KJA).
August 23, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #8 Proposed Agreed Order for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint by William Crenshaw (KJA)
August 23, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #12 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD (KJA)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against TRG Holdings G & H, LLC, Gram Resources, Inc., Hazard Radiology Associates, Inc., Anand Lalaji, MD, The Radiology Group, LLC by TRG Holdings G & H, LLC.(Miller, Donald)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE by TRG Holdings G & H, LLC Defendant's Notice of Absence of Service of Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Service)(Miller, Donald) Modified to further describe on 8/23/2021 (KJA).
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS to #6 Plaintiffs Motion to Remand filed by TRG Holdings G & H, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Proof of Pmts)(Miller, Donald)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint by William Crenshaw. (Hunter, Barry)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 : Defendants SHALL, in a brief of no more than ten pages, respond to the motion and show cause for why this matter should not be remanded. That brief shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, August 20, 2021. Plaintiffs shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 24, 2021, to reply (although they may rest on or incorporate, to the extent they choose, the remand motion). The response shall confirm Plaintiffs citizenship (not just residency). Defendants shall address the true citizenship of each defense party, the claimed Hertz theory as to both prongs of corporate citizenship, any fraudulent joinder argument (in the specific context of the claims made by Plaintiffs), and application of the forum defendant rule. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 08/19/2021.(KJA)cc: COR
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Deposit, #2 Exhibit August 15 Email, #3 Exhibit Draft Restraining Order, #4 Exhibit Defective Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Kentucky Secretary of State Filings, #6 Proposed Order)(Maclin, Robert)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD to Enter Written Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Restraining Order, #2 Restraining Order Bond)(Maclin, Robert) Modified to remove referral language on 8/19/2021 (KJA).
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Ethan F. Johnson by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration, #2 L.R. 83.1, #3 L.R. 83.2)(JLC)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gram Resources, Inc., Hazard Radiology Associates, Inc., TRG Holdings G & H, LLC, The Radiology Group, LLC. (JLC)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Perry County Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00221. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5043639), filed by Gram Resources, Inc., William Crenshaw, Anand Lalaji, MD, The Radiology Group, LLC, Hazard Radiology Associates, Inc., TRG Holdings G & H, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Record Complaint, #4 State Court Record Plaintiff's Notice of Service, #5 State Court Record Plaintiff's Motion for Restraining Order, #6 State Court Record Plaintiff's Supplement to Motion for Restraining Order, #7 State Court Record Defendant's Response to Motion for Restraining Order, #8 William Crenshaw Consent to Removal, #9 State Court Exhibits)(JLC)
August 16, 2021 MOTION FOR RESTRAINING ORDER by Mahender Pampati, MD, Ashokkumar R. Patel, MD. Filed in State Court record. See DE #1 . (JLC) Modified on 8/18/2021 (JLC). Modified on 8/18/2021 (JLC). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 8/18/2021 (JLC).
August 16, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JLC)
August 16, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Weir for review: re MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Gram Resources, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashokkumar R. Patel,, M.D
Represented By: Christopher J. Shaughnessy
Represented By: Daniel Luke Morgan
Represented By: Lisa English Hinkle
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahender Pampati, M.D.
Represented By: Christopher J. Shaughnessy
Represented By: Daniel Luke Morgan
Represented By: Lisa English Hinkle
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gram Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Ethan F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazard Radiology Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Ethan F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Lalaji, M.D.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Ethan F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Radiology Group, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Ethan F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Crenshaw
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Ethan F. Johnson
Represented By: Barry D. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRG Holdings G & H, LLC
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Ethan F. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?