Bowling v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamie Bowling
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2021cv00157
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Jamie Bowling.(Smallwood, Erin)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER (civil): 1) the following ddlns shall be observed: a) Initial disclosures by 11/27/21 These need not be filed in the Court record; b) Discovery. i. Fact Discovery by 8/30/22; and ii. Expert discovery nlt 8/30/22; c. Supplementation as stated. Supplemental disclosures & responses need not be filed in the Court record; d. Motions to join addl parties or amend pleadings nlt 12/12/21 e. Identity of expert witnesses and written reports: i. Pla -4/30/22; and ii. Dft 6/30/22; These need not be filed in the Court record f. Dispositive motions and motions objecting to the admissibility of expert testimony nlt 9/30/22, w/response & reply time per Rule; 2. Parties to observe FRCivP 5(d) directives; 3. PTC before the undersigned on 2/21/23 at 10:00 a.m. at London. 4. NLT 21 days prior to ptc, counsel shall file the filing: a. wit & exh list as stated; b. motions in limine; c. evid depos to be used at trial; d. pt memo as stated; e. proposed agreed jury instructions; and f. proposed voir dire. 5. NLT 14 days before ptc: a. written objs; b. responses to motion in limine; c. responses to any motion for ruling. 6. At ptc, counsel shall be prepared to: a. make possible stipulations of admissibility; b. disclose demo or summary exhs; c. display all exhs to be used at trial; d. discuss possibility of settlement; e. advise Court of anticipated tech issues; 7. NLT 7 working days prior to trial counsel shall submit to Chambers a copy of each doc exh. 8. TRIAL BY JURY on 3/21/23 at 9:00 a.m. at London. Counsel present by 8:30 a.m. Anticipated length 4-5 days. 9. Referred to MJ Hanly A. Ingram to: a. resolve all non-dispositive motions; b. manage discovery; c. manage pt sched issues; d. Conduct mid-discovery telephonic conference; e. conduct settlement conference. 10. Discovery disputes as stated. 11. Modification of this schedule is unlikely & will occur only for good cause. Discovery due by 8/30/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 12/12/2021. Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 12/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2022. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in LONDON before Judge Claria Horn Boom. JURY TRIAL set for 3/21/2023 at 09:00 AM, counsel at 8:30 AM in LONDON before Judge Claria Horn Boom. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/14/21.(SYD)cc: COR
October 14, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Claria Horn Boom for review: #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JMB)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bokeno, Andrew-John)
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Bokeno, Andrew-John)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT1.) Parties shall meet within twenty-one (21) days.2.) Within fourteen (14) days after meeting, parties shall file a written joint report outlining discovery plan and stating whether prompt settlement possible.3.) Any party required to file a disclosure statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 must do so by the time of joint status report.. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/24/21.(JLC)cc: COR
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Bowling. (Smallwood, Erin)
September 24, 2021 NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Andrew-John Bokeno: an Order was mailed to a non-registered attorney, which is in violation of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The referenced document is: #4 Answer to Complaint. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. Failure to comply may result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, Andrew-John Bokeno by US Mail (JLC)
September 24, 2021 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Andrew-John Bokeno: re #4 Answer to Complaint. A PHV e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Andrew-John Bokeno (JLC)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Burd, James)
September 17, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (KJA)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Laurel Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00597. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5075797), filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowling v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Bowling
Represented By: Hoyt Grimshaw
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew-John Bokeno
Represented By: James M. Burd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?