Duzane et al v. Tamer
Petitioner: Celeste Tamer Duzane
Respondent: Herbert H. Tamer
In Re: The Estate of Richard H. Tamer
Case Number: 6:2021cv00159
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer (KJA)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer filed by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Herbert H. Tamer)(Coryell, Cornelius)
October 20, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Celeste Tamer Duzane(Guardian for) Richard ("Dick") H. Tamer (KJA)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to #7 Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Motion to Remand filed by Celeste Tamer Duzane(Individually). (Monarch, Charles)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Celeste Tamer Duzane(Guardian for) Richard ("Dick") H. Tamer filed by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coryell, Cornelius)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the joint filing (D.E. #9 ), construed as a motion to stay discovery, is GRANTED. The setting of a discovery schedule is held in abeyance pending resolution of the pending motions (D.E. #7 , #9 ).Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 10/12/2021. (KJA)cc: COR Ivan Schell via US Mail
October 8, 2021 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (KJA)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to #6 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss filed by Celeste Tamer Duzane(Individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Probating, #2 Exhibit B - Last Will and Testament of Richard H. Tamer, #3 Exhibit C - Order Appointing Guardian, #4 Exhibit D - deeds to Middlesboro Properties)(Monarch, Charles)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 ***CONSTRUED AS A MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY per D.E. #11 . FIRST REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Monarch, Charles) Modified event type and text on 10/12/2021 (KJA).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Celeste Tamer Duzane (Guardian for) Richard ("Dick") H. Tamer filed by Celeste Tamer Duzane: The Court ORDERS Defendant Tamer to respond to the motion to remand w/in 10 days of this order. Plaintiff Duzane will then have 5 days from filing date of Defendant's response to reply. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 10/5/2021.(APR)cc: COR
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION to Remand by Celeste Tamer Duzane(Guardian for) Richard ("Dick") H. Tamer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Petitioner's Tendered Order Remanding to Bell County)(Monarch, Charles)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Herbert H. Tamer, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit - Will, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit - 5/24/21 Order, #4 Proposed Order)(Coryell, Cornelius)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Ivan Schell by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (KJA)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: District Judge Wier has referred this matter to the undersigned to direct the parties to "timely conduct a Rule 26(f) conference," and establish a schedule, among other things. D.E. #3 at 1-2. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26, the Court ORDERS as follows: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates.(2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 09/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR, Ivan Schell via US Mail
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 09/20/2021.(KJA)cc: COR
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bell District Court, case number 19-P-0017. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5078228), filed by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KJA)
September 20, 2021 MOTION to Reopen and Petition for Removal of Trustee and Appointment of Successor Trustee by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. Attached to the NOR #1 -1 as part of the state court record. (KJA) Modified motion text on 9/20/2021 (KJA).
September 20, 2021 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
September 20, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: re MOTION to Reopen and Petition for Removal of Trustee and Appointment of Successor Trustee by Herbert H. Tamer, Herbert H. Tamer. Attached to the NOR #1 -1 as part of the state court record (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duzane et al v. Tamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: The Estate of Richard H. Tamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Celeste Tamer Duzane
Represented By: Charles Edward Monarch
Represented By: Ivan Schell
Represented By: Ivan J. Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Herbert H. Tamer
Represented By: Cornelius E. Coryell, II
Represented By: Matthew Robert Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?