Phillips v. Beshear
Petitioner: Donald Rolin Phillips
Respondent: Andy Beshear
Case Number: 6:2021cv00175
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: It is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED as follows: (1) The petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed by Petitioner Donald Rolin Phillips (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED. (2) This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. (3) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/29/2021.(KJA)cc: COR and Donald Rolin Phillips by US Mail
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Phillips's petition for a writ of habeas corpus (Doc. #1 ) is DENIED. (2) All pending motions are DENIED as moot. (3) The Court will enter an appropriate Judgment. (4) This matter is STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 11/29/2021.(KJA)cc: COR and Donald Rolin Phillips by US Mail
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Habeas Petition filing fee received - $ 5, receipt number 6009226 (JLC)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #7 Filing Fee Received (JLC)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: (1) Phillips's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED; and (2) Phillips must pay $5.00 filing fee to Clerk within 30 days from date of this Order. If he fails to do so, the Court will deny his petition without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/13/2021. (APR)cc: COR and Donald Rolin Phillips by US Mail
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(APR)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Rolin Phillips (APR)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (APR)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Rolin Phillips. (APR) Modified date filed on 10/7/2021 (APR).
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Rolin Phillips Motions referred to P SO. (APR)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Donald Rolin Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope postmarked 9/30/2021)(APR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Beshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Rolin Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andy Beshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?