CollisionRight, LLC v. KY Collision Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CollisionRight, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Kentucky Collision Center
Defendant: KY Collision Center, LLC and David Austin Ponder
Case Number: 6:2022cv00109
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR RULE 26 MEETING OF THE PARTIES: Accordingly, and the Court otherwise being sufficiently advised, IT IS HEREBYORDERED the deadline for the Rule 26 meeting of the parties is extended forty-five (45) days from June 27, 2022 to August 11, 2022. The report is due to be filed by August 25, 2022. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 6/24/2022. (MM)cc: COR
June 24, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Agreed Order extending deadline for Rule 26 first meeting pending settlement discussions by CollisionRight, LLC. (Wheat, Jack)
June 24, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: #12 Proposed Agreed Order extending deadline for Rule 26 first meeting pending settlement discussions by CollisionRight, LLC (KJA)
June 24, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due date updated per DE #13 Order. (MM)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: (1) Within 21 days, the parties, by counsel (if represented by counsel), shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. (2) Within 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 06/06/2022. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 MJ Consent Form)(KJA)cc: COR
June 2, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David Austin Ponder, pro se. Styled as Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Various, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope postmarked 5/27/2022)(MM)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CollisionRight, LLC via personal delivery to David Austin Ponder served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Wheat, Jack)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CollisionRight, LLC via personal delivery to KY Collision Center, LLC served on 5/23/2022, answer due 6/13/2022. (Wheat, Jack)
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint cc: form e-mailed to Register. (KJA)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 FIRST FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CollisionRight, LLC. (Wheat, Jack)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jack A. Wheat. #1 Complaint has been filed by CollisionRight, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SYD)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (SYD)cc: COR
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KY Collision Center, LLC, David Austin Ponder; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (KJA)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CollisionRight, LLC. Filing fee $402; receipt number AKYEDC-5269300 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Trademark registration, #3 Summons Ky Collision Center LLC, #4 Summons David Ponder)(SYD)
May 18, 2022 Conflict Check run. (SYD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CollisionRight, LLC v. KY Collision Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CollisionRight, LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company doing business as Kentucky Collision Center
Represented By: Bruce Benjamin Paul
Represented By: Jack A. Wheat
Represented By: Peter J. Rosene
Represented By: Robert E. Maclin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KY Collision Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Austin Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?