Patterson v. Gibbs et al
Plaintiff: Gary Patterson
Defendant: Casey Gibbs, M. Carroll, Joseph Pruitt, Crystal Scott, S. Woods, USA, Michael Carvajal and Chris Bina
Case Number: 6:2022cv00129
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Referring Judge: P SO
2 Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Filing 13 Letter from Damian Murphy concerning his contractual agreement with Gary Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contractual Agreement for Services, #2 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 09/07/2022) (KJA)
September 9, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review: #13 Letter from Damian Murphy concerning his contractual agreement with Gary Patterson. (KJA)
August 23, 2022 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Gary Patterson re #12 Letter : A courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. If you would like a copy of any document previously filed in your record, please send a request to the Office of the Clerk noting the docket entry number for each copy requested. You will receive a response advising you of the total number of pages and the amount of money required to obtain the requested copies. Copies of the documents in your record will require a pre-payment of 50 cents per page. cc: Gary Patterson by US Mail (KJA)
August 22, 2022 Filing 12 Letter from Gary Patterson requesting a copy of the docket sheet and all documents in this case. (Attachments: #1 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 08/17/2022) (KJA)
August 19, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gary Patterson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service and Waivers)(Crutcher, Gregory) Modified text on 8/22/2022 (KJA).
August 15, 2022 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #10 Certificate of Service was an INCORRECT PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Certificate of Service within seven (7) calendar days. *TDA* cc: COR (KJA)
August 15, 2022 Filing 10 STRICKEN FROM THE DOCKET: INCORRECT DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice Action Striking Document filed on 8/15/2022. Modified text on 8/18/2022 (KJA).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier.. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/2019.(MRS)cc: COR
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. The next step in the litigation is for Patterson, through counsel, to serve each of the named defendants with a summons and copy of the amended complaint, in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 2. Once the defendants are properly served, they must then answer or otherwise respond to Pattersons amended complaint, in accordance with Rule 12. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 08/03/2022.(KJA)cc: COR
August 2, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #6 Filing Fee Received (KJA)
August 1, 2022 Filing 6 Filing fee received - $ 402, receipt number 600000136 (KJA)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Gary Patterson against M. Carroll, M. Carroll, Casey Gibbs, Casey Gibbs, Joseph Pruitt, Joseph Pruitt, Crystal Scott, Crystal Scott, S. Woods, S. Woods, filed by Gary Patterson.(Crutcher, Gregory)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: 1. Clerk send (a) a form Civil Rights Complaint [EDKY Form 520]; (b) an Affidavit of Assets / In Forma Pauperis Application [Form AO-240]; and (c) a Certificate of Inmate Account [EDKY Form 523].to plaintiff; 2. Patterson must complete and file the complaint form, describing the facts of his case, specifically identifying the people, dates, places, and actions that are relevant to his claims, and explain what he wants the Court to do. 3. Patterson must either submit forms or pay fee; 4. Patterson must take these steps within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 07/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 EDKy Form 520, #2 AO 240 Form, #3 EDKy Form 523)(KJA)cc: COR and Gary Patterson by US Mail
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KJA)
July 14, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (KJA)
July 14, 2022 Conflict Check run. (KJA)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Gary Patterson, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Cover Letter, #3 mailing envelope, front and back, postmarked 07/08/2022)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Gibbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Patterson
Represented By: Gregory L. Crutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?