Garner v. Gilley
Petitioner: Tony Garner
Respondent: J. Gilley
Case Number: 6:2022cv00149
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to J. Gilley, Warden re #4 Order. (KJA)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to U.S. Attorney EDKy re #4 Order. (KJA)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 HABEAS CORPUS Filing fee received - $ 5.00, receipt number 600000178 (MM)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of Garner's petition [R. #1 ] and this Order by certified mail to both (a) Respondent J. Gilley, Warden at USP McCreary, and (b) the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of KY. 2.Within 60 days from the entry of this Order, Respondent shall file a response to Garner's petition. That response shall be filed in the form of a memorandum addressing the factual allegations and legal claims contained in the petition. Respondent shall also attach any relevant documentary evidence and address any applicable defenses. 3. Garner must promptly inform the Court in writing of any change in his mailing address. If Garner fails to do so, the Court may dismiss his case. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 8/22/2022.(APR)cc: COR and Tony Garner by US Mail. Modified text on 8/22/2022 (APR).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(APR)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Note re #4 Order: Clerk sent copies of Order and Petition #1 via certified mail to Respondent and U.S. Attorney's Office as directed. (APR)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (KJA)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Tony Garner, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Cover Letter re Filing Fee, #3 mailing envelope, front and back, postmark unknown)(KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tony Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?